This case was last updated from PACER on 01/20/2019 at 08:12:37 (UTC).

Bagby v. State Farm Casualty Insura et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2018 Bagby filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against State Farm Casualty Insura. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard W. Story. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05353

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard W. Story

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vincent A. Bagby

Marietta, GA 30068

Defendants

Jeremy Berry

Lexis Nexis C.L.U.E.

City of Atlanta Fire Dept.

State Farm Casualty Insura

Michael L. Tipsord

Fred Hinson

Mayor Mohamed Kasim Reed

Ralph T. Hudgins

Norris Hobbes Gresham

Joanne Oni

Mayor Keisha Lance Bottoms

City of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc

Menase Zewde

Cathy Hampton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Rita M. Cherry

Attorney at City of Atlanta Law Department

Suite 5000, 55 Trinity Avenue, S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30303-3520

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER dismissing as moot #14 Motion to Dismiss and #15 Motion for Default Judgment. On December 13, 2018, the Court dismissed this case because the Court does not have subject matter jurisdiction [Doc. No. #12 ]. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 01/03/2019. (rsg) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Jeremy Berry, Keisha Lance Bottoms, City of Atlanta Fire Dept., City of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc, Norris Hobbes Gresham, Cathy Hampton, Mohamed Kasim Reed. (Cherry, Rita) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#18

(#18) NOTICE Of Manual Filing with attachments by Vincent A. Bagby. (bdb) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#17

(#17) NOTICE Of Manual Filing of Proof of Service of Discovery by Vincent A. Bagby. (bdb) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#16

(#16) NOTICE Of Manual Filing of Proof of Servic3e of Motion for Judgment by Default by Vincent A. Bagby. (bdb) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#12

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Vincent A. Bagby re #12 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #13 Clerk's Judgment. (dgr) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

(#7) NOTICE Of Manual Filing re: Exhibits/Pleadings by Vincent A. Bagby. (bdb) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE Of Manual Filing with attachments by Vincent A. Bagby. (bdb) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#5

(#5) Notice of Manual Filing of Return of Service Executed by Vincent A. Bagby. City of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (bdb) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Vincent A. Bagby. (dgr) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- (Entered: 11/29/2018)

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

Submission of #3 Complaint for frivolity determination to District Judge Richard W. Story. (dgr) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#2

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Vincent A. Bagby re #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (dgr) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Vincent A. Bagby re #19 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Default Judgment. (rsg) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER dismissing as moot #14 Motion to Dismiss and #15 Motion for Default Judgment. On December 13, 2018, the Court dismissed this case because the Court does not have subject matter jurisdiction [Doc. No. #12 ]. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 01/03/2019. (rsg) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to State Farm, #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, to District Judge Richard W. Story. (rsg) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Jeremy Berry, Keisha Lance Bottoms, City of Atlanta Fire Dept., City of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc, Norris Hobbes Gresham, Cathy Hampton, Mohamed Kasim Reed. (Cherry, Rita) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE Of Manual Filing with attachments by Vincent A. Bagby. (bdb) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE Of Manual Filing of Proof of Service of Discovery by Vincent A. Bagby. (bdb) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE Of Manual Filing of Proof of Servic3e of Motion for Judgment by Default by Vincent A. Bagby. (bdb) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Vincent A. Bagby re #12 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #13 Clerk's Judgment. (dgr) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing this action. (dgr)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Civil Case Terminated. (dgr) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE Of Manual Filing re: Exhibits/Pleadings by Vincent A. Bagby. (bdb) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE Of Manual Filing with attachments by Vincent A. Bagby. (bdb) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Manual Filing of Return of Service Executed by Vincent A. Bagby. City of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (bdb) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Vincent A. Bagby re #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (dgr) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #3 Complaint for frivolity determination to District Judge Richard W. Story. (dgr) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Vincent A. Bagby. (dgr) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT filed by Vincent A. Bagby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is further ORDERED that service of process shall not issue at the present time. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to submit this case to the assigned district judge for a frivolity determination pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 11/29/2018. (dgr) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (eop) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Vincent A. Bagby. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Partial Summary Judgement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.