This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2018 at 03:45:24 (UTC).

Bae et al v. Tricam Industries, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2018 Bae filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Tricam Industries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul W. Grimm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-00066

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul W. Grimm

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Joanne Lee

Jewan Bae

Defendants

Home Depot, Inc.

Zhejiang Sopop Industrial Co. LTD.

Gorilla Ladders

Home Depot USA, Inc.

Tricam Industries, Inc.

Tricam Industries, Asia LTD

Greg Olin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua S Berman

Attorney at Dross Berman LLC

600 Jefferson Plaza, Suite 402

Rockville, MD 20852

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin M Cox

Attorney at Anderson Coe King

Seven Saint Paul Street, Suite 1600

Baltimore, MD 21202

Matthew T Angotti

Attorney at Anderson Coe and King LLP

Seven St. Paul Street, Suite 1600

Baltimore, MD 21202-1653

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Filing #1 Notice of Removal by Home Depot USA, Inc., Home Depot, Inc., Greg Olin, Tricam Industries, Asia LTD, Tricam Industries, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

17 #2

Request for Production of Documents

17 #1

Interrogatories

#17

(#17) Notice of filing of state court discovery material by Tricam Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Interrogatories, #2 Request for Production of Documents)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Pending Events by Circuit Court for Montgomery County. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

15 #2

Plaintiffs' Interrogatories

15 #1

Plaintiffs' Requests for Production of Documents

#15

(#15) Notice of filing of state court discovery material by Jewan Bae, Joanne Lee (Attachments: #1 Requests for Production of Documents, #2 Interrogatories)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Home Depot USA, Inc., Home Depot, Inc.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Tricam Industries, Asia LTD, Tricam Industries, Inc.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#12

(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint served upon Home Depot Inc. and Home Depot USA Inc. on 12/12/2017.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint served upon Tricam Industries, Asia LTD on 12/9/2017.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint served upon Gorilla Ladders on 12/9/2017.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tricam Industries, Inc. Tricam Industries, Inc. served on 12/9/2017, answer due 2/7/2018.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

2 #1

Case Information Report

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Gorilla Ladders, Home Depot USA, Inc., Home Depot, Inc., Greg Olin, Tricam Industries, Asia LTD, Tricam Industries, Inc., Zhejiang Sopop Industrial Co. LTD., filed by Joanne Lee, Jewan Bae. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Circuit Court for Montgomery County, case number 440509-V, filed by Home Depot USA, Inc., Tricam Industries, Inc., Home Depot, Inc., Greg Olin, Tricam Industries, Asia LTD. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637103172) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-18) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Filing #1 Notice of Removal by Home Depot USA, Inc., Home Depot, Inc., Greg Olin, Tricam Industries, Asia LTD, Tricam Industries, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Notice of filing of state court discovery material by Tricam Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Interrogatories, #2 Request for Production of Documents)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Pending Events by Circuit Court for Montgomery County. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Notice of filing of state court discovery material by Jewan Bae, Joanne Lee (Attachments: #1 Requests for Production of Documents, #2 Interrogatories)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Home Depot USA, Inc., Home Depot, Inc.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Tricam Industries, Asia LTD, Tricam Industries, Inc.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint served upon Home Depot Inc. and Home Depot USA Inc. on 12/12/2017.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint served upon Tricam Industries, Asia LTD on 12/9/2017.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint served upon Gorilla Ladders on 12/9/2017.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tricam Industries, Inc. Tricam Industries, Inc. served on 12/9/2017, answer due 2/7/2018.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER for Mandatory Settlement Conference/Pretrial Hearing. Signed by Judge Robert A. Greenberg, Circuit Court for Montgomery County on 11/30/2017.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert A. Greenberg, Circuit Court for Montgomery County on 11/30/2017.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SCHEDULING Notice and ORDER of Court. Signed by Judge Robert A. Greenberg, Circuit Court for Montgomery County on 11/30/2017. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of New Case Number. (Signed by Barbara H. Meiklejohn, Clerk for Circuit Court for Montgomery County) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued 30 days as to Greg Olin.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued 60 days as to Tricam Industries, Inc.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Gorilla Ladders, Home Depot USA, Inc., Home Depot, Inc., Greg Olin, Tricam Industries, Asia LTD, Tricam Industries, Inc., Zhejiang Sopop Industrial Co. LTD., filed by Joanne Lee, Jewan Bae. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Circuit Court for Montgomery County, case number 440509-V, filed by Home Depot USA, Inc., Tricam Industries, Inc., Home Depot, Inc., Greg Olin, Tricam Industries, Asia LTD. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637103172) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.