This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2018 at 13:12:41 (UTC).

Badger Daylighting LTD et al v. Badger Excavating, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2017 Badger Daylighting LTD filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Badger Excavating, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dana L. Christensen and Jeremiah C. Lynch. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:17-CV-00001

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana L. Christensen

Referral Judge

Jeremiah C. Lynch

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Badger Daylighting LTD

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Badger Excavating, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Shane A. Vannatta

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Robert C. Griffin

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all deadlines are VACATED and any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/4/2018. (NOS)

#36

(#36) ORDER ADOPTING 34 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 21 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/21/2017. (APP)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for CRAIG E. PINKUS. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 2/23/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 2/9/2017. (APP)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all deadlines are VACATED and any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/4/2018. (NOS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ORDER ADOPTING 34 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 21 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/21/2017. (APP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for CRAIG E. PINKUS. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 2/23/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 2/9/2017. (APP)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Badger Daylighting Corp. is a litigant