This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2018 at 07:47:01 (UTC).

Bacon v. Entzel

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 Bacon filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Entzel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Trumble and Gina M. Groh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00148

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert W. Trumble

Presiding Judge

Gina M. Groh

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Harold Bacon

Bruceton Mills, WV 26525

Respondent

Frederick Entzel

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/1/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#13

(#13) RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/1/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#12

(#12) RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/27/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

11 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#11

(#11) ORDER VACATING ORDER DATED SEPTEMBER 25, 2018 AND TERMINATING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUERIS AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9/26/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 09/26/2018)

10 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#10

(#10) VACATED based on Order entered on 9/26/2018. ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BUT DIRECTING PETITIONER TO PAY THE $5.00 FILING FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9/25/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). Modified on 9/26/2018 (tlg). (Entered: 09/25/2018)

9 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#9

(#9) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9/24/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#6

(#6) RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice (Other), #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/18/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#5

RESTRICTED

4 #2

Certified Mail Return Receipt

4 #1

Court-Approved Form

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2018: #1 Court-Approved Form) (tlg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2018: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 09/14/2018)

3 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 09/14/2018)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/1/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/1/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/27/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER VACATING ORDER DATED SEPTEMBER 25, 2018 AND TERMINATING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUERIS AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9/26/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) VACATED based on Order entered on 9/26/2018. ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BUT DIRECTING PETITIONER TO PAY THE $5.00 FILING FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9/25/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). Modified on 9/26/2018 (tlg). (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9/24/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Harold Bacon. (Attachments: #1 ledger sheets, #2 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Harold Bacon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice (Other), #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/18/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNM001388 (tlg) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2018: #1 Court-Approved Form) (tlg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2018: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Harold Bacon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Frederick Entzel, filed by Harold Bacon. (Attachments: #1 memorandum in support of petition; #2 sworn declaration; #3 Exhibit A, transcript excerpt; #4 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less