This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:38 (UTC).

Ayres v. Pash et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Ayres filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Pash. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Greg Kays and Prisoner Pro Se. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-06127

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg Kays

Referral Judge

Prisoner Pro Se

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Achilles Z Ayres

Cameron, MO 64429

Defendants

Ronda J. Pash

Trish Rogers

Terry Page

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the clerk of the court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, an initial partial filing fee of $3.75; (3) the Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff another set of civil rights forms for his use in filing an amended complaint; (4) Plaintiff is directed to file a single superseding amended complaint, as specifically discussed herein; and (5) Plaintiff's failure to both pay the required initial partial filing fee and amend as directed, on or before September 18, 2018, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on August 28, 2018 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (CLERK'S NOTE: Civil rights forms mailed to plaintiff with copy of order as directed.) (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER: ORDERED that this case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Any motion to reopen must be filed on or before October 19, 2018, and must be accompanied by the initial partial filing fee and Plaintiff's superseding amended complaint, as previously ordered. Signed on October 5, 2018 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Achilles Z Ayres. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#8

(#8) CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED that this case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Any motion to reopen must be filed on or before October 19, 2018, and must be accompanied by the initial partial filing fee and Plaintiff's superseding amended complaint, as previously ordered. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Achilles Z Ayres. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED that this case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Any motion to reopen must be filed on or before October 19, 2018, and must be accompanied by the initial partial filing fee and Plaintiff's superseding amended complaint, as previously ordered. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: ORDERED that this case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Any motion to reopen must be filed on or before October 19, 2018, and must be accompanied by the initial partial filing fee and Plaintiff's superseding amended complaint, as previously ordered. Signed on October 5, 2018 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • (#6) ORDER: ORDERED that, because Plaintiff has not paid the initial partial filing fee as previously ordered, Plaintiff shall show cause, on or before October 4, 2018 as to why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Signed on September 20, 2018 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the clerk of the court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, an initial partial filing fee of $3.75; (3) the Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff another set of civil rights forms for his use in filing an amended complaint; (4) Plaintiff is directed to file a single superseding amended complaint, as specifically discussed herein; and (5) Plaintiff's failure to both pay the required initial partial filing fee and amend as directed, on or before September 18, 2018, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on August 28, 2018 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (CLERK'S NOTE: Civil rights forms mailed to plaintiff with copy of order as directed.) (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Achilles Z Ayres. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Achilles Z Ayres. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Achilles Z Ayres. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less