This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2021 at 07:03:32 (UTC).

Avnet Incorporated v. Hitachi Chemical Company Limited et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2017 Avnet Incorporated filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Hitachi Chemical Company Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James Donato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-07046

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Avnet Incorporated

Defendants

Shizuki Electric Company Limited

Matsuo Electric Company Limited

Taitsu Corporation

Toshin Kogyo Company Limited

Hitachi AIC Incorporated

Taitsu America Incorporated

Shinyei Technology Company Limited

Hitachi Chemical Company Limited

Hitachi Chemical Company America Limited

Nitsuko Electronics Corporation

Shinyei Capacitor Company Limited

ELNA Company Limited

Milestone Global Technology Incorporated

Holy Stone Enterprise Company Limited

Okaya Electric America Incorporated

Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated

Shinyei Kaisha

Nissei Electric Company Limited

Okaya Electric Industries Company Limited

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jerry Goldsmith

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste. 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Amy Abdo

Attorney at Fennemore Craig PC - Phoenix, AZ

2394 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 600

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Carrie Alane Pixler Ryerson

Attorney at Fennemore Craig PC - Phoenix, AZ

2394 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 600

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Lori P. Lustrin

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price and Axelrod, LLP

1450 Brickell Avenue, Suite 2300

Miami, FL 33131-3456

Robert W Turken

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste. 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Scott N. Wagner

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

200 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 2500

Miami, FL 33131

Shalia S Sakona

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste. 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Victoria Ann Stazio

Attorney at Fennemore Craig PC - Phoenix, AZ

2394 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 600

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorneys

Jasmina Richter

Attorney at Sanders & Parks PC

3030 N 3Rd St., Ste. 1300

Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099

Robert J. Bruno

Attorney at Robert J. Bruno, Ltd.

1601 East Highway 13

Burnsville, MN 55337

Bonnie Lau

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jarod M Bona

Attorney at Bona Law PC

4275 Executive Sq., Ste. 200

La Jolla, CA 92037

Jeffrey C. Bank

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

1700 K Street Nw, Fifth Floor

Washington, DC 20006

Gaspare Joseph Bono

Attorney at Dentons US LLP - Washington DC

1301 K St. Nw, Ste. 600 E Tower

Washington, DC 20005-3364

Ashley M Bauer

Attorney at Latham & Watkins - San Francisco, CA

505 Montgomery St., Ste. 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111

Allyson Theresa Fortier

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP - Los Angeles, CA

350 S Grand Ave., Ste. 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Adam R. Prescott

1875 Pennsylvania Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Eric Patrick Enson

Attorney at Jones Day - Los Angeles, CA

555 West Fifth Street, Suite 4600

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Meghan E Hausler

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie LLP - Dallas, TX

2300 Trammell Crow Ctr., 2001 Ross Ave.

Dallas, TX 75201

John Robert Fornaciari

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP - Washington, DC

1050 Connecticut Ave. Nw, Ste. 1100

Washington, DC 20036

19 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#2853

(#231) ORDER RE MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. LESLIE M. MARX. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/18/2021. (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2021) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#2711

RESTRICTED

#2710

#1365

#223

RESTRICTED

#222

#1281

RESTRICTED

#1279

4 #14

Summons

4 #13

Summons

4 #11

Summons

4 #9

Summons

4 #8

Summons

3 #1

Instructions

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

942 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#231) ORDER RE MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. LESLIE M. MARX. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/18/2021. (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2021) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#230) Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 8-11-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (2132 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 8/17/2020) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#229) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Concurrent Expert Witness Proceeding held on 8/11/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/12/2020) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docket(#228) ORDER. The concurrent expert proceeding in the DAP cases will be held on August 11, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., by Zoom Webinar. The parties are directed to email Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark (jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov) by 5 p.m. on August 10, 2020, the names of their lead counsel and experts who will be speaking during the proceeding. The experts and lead counsel are requested to call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/7/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#227) ORDER RE CONCURRENT EXPERT WITNESS PROCEEDING. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/28/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#226) Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 4-16-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1278 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1280 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 4/17/2020) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#225) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 4/16/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/17/2020) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • Docket(#224) ORDER. The status conference set for April 16, 2020, at 11 a.m., will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party group should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name and email address of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at # jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by April 15, 2020, at 4:00 p.m., California time. The email addresses for counsel are needed for the appropriate Z oom link, which Ms. Clark will circulate by email prior to the conference. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. Other attorneys on the case who will not be speaking, and members of the press and public, may view the webinar as attendees at the following link: #https://zoom.us/j/98659502400?pwd=L1gvYlg5c0p5UmxkWkJLNVF2VGJzZ z09 Webinar ID: 986 5950 2400 Password: 858633 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +12532158782,,98659502400# or +13017158592,,98659502400# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099International numbers available: #https://zoom.us/u/auEUH85xn < br

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#223) ORDER. The Court sets a telephonic status conference for April 16, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. for the following DAP cases: Case Nos. 17-7046, 17-7047, 18-2657, 19-1902, and 19-3296. The status conference will be held on the Court's conference call line. The dial-in number is 1-877-402-9753, and the access code is 5266369. The parties are requested to dial in from a landline if at all possible, and to mute themselves whenever they are not speaking. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/1/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020) (lrcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#222) Letter from Certain DAPs Requesting Telephonic Status Conference . (Turken, Robert) (Filed on 3/30/2020) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
229 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2016
  • PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX175512 as to Lori P Lustrin. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lori P Lustrin on behalf of Avnet Incorporated. (BAS) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX175513 as to Robert W Turken. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Robert W Turken on behalf of Avnet Incorporated. (BAS) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Avnet Incorporated.(submitted by Amy Abdo) (EJA) (Entered: 08/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Related Cases by Avnet Incorporated.(submitted by Amy Abdo) (EJA) (Entered: 08/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) *SUMMONS Issued as to ELNA America Incorporated, ELNA Company Limited, Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Company America Limited, Hitachi Chemical Company Limited, Holy Stone Enterprise Company Limited, Matsuo Electric Company Limited, Milestone Global Technology Incorporated, Nissei Electric Company Limited, Nitsuko Electronics Corporation, Okaya Electric America Incorporated, Okaya Electric Industries Company Limited, Shinyei Capacitor Company Limited, Shinyei Corporation of America Incorporated, Shinyei Kaisha, Shinyei Technology Company Limited, Shizuki Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated, Taitsu America Incorporated, Taitsu Corporation, Toshin Kogyo Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons)(EJA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. *Modified to correct event and docket text on 8/23/2016 (REK)/(SCH). (Entered: 08/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13303137. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David K Duncan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-16-02808-PHX-DKD. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Instructions)(EJA) (Entered: 08/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Avnet Incorporated.(submitted by Amy Abdo) (EJA) (Entered: 08/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13303137 filed by Avnet Incorporated.(submitted by Amy Abdo) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(EJA) (Entered: 08/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less