This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2021 at 01:44:04 (UTC).

Avnet Incorporated v. Hitachi Chemical Company Limited et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2016 Avnet Incorporated filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Hitachi Chemical Company Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Roslyn O Silver. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:16-CV-02808

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roslyn O Silver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Avnet Incorporated

Defendants

Hitachi Chemical Company Limited

Shizuki Electric Company Limited

Matsuo Electric Company Limited

Taitsu Corporation

Toshin Kogyo Company Limited

Hitachi AIC Incorporated

Taitsu America Incorporated

Shinyei Technology Company Limited

Hitachi Chemical Company America Limited

Nitsuko Electronics Corporation

Shinyei Capacitor Company Limited

ELNA Company Limited

ELNA America Incorporated

Holy Stone Enterprise Company Limited

Okaya Electric America Incorporated

Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated

Shinyei Kaisha

Nissei Electric Company Limited

Okaya Electric Industries Company Limited

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shalia S Sakona

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste. 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Jerry Goldsmith

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste. 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Carrie Alane Pixler Ryerson

Attorney at Fennemore Craig PC - Phoenix, AZ

2394 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 600

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Scott N Wagner

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste. 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Lori P Lustrin

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste. 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Robert W Turken

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste. 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Victoria Ann Stazio

Attorney at Fennemore Craig PC - Phoenix, AZ

2394 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 600

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Amy Abdo

Attorney at Fennemore Craig PC - Phoenix, AZ

2394 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 600

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorneys

Chul Pak

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati LLP - New York, NY

1301 Avenue Of The Americas, 40Th Fl.

New York, NY 10019

Robert J Bruno

Attorney at Sanders & Parks PC

3030 N 3Rd St., Ste. 1300

Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099

Jasmina Richter

Attorney at Sanders & Parks PC

3030 N 3Rd St., Ste. 1300

Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099

Bonnie Lau

Attorney at Dentons US LLP - San Francisco, CA

1 Market Plz., 24Th Fl.

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jarod M Bona

Attorney at Bona Law PC

4275 Executive Sq., Ste. 200

La Jolla, CA 92037

Gaspare Joseph Bono

Attorney at Dentons US LLP - Washington DC

1301 K St. Nw, Ste. 600 E Tower

Washington, DC 20005-3364

Ashley M Bauer

Attorney at Latham & Watkins - San Francisco, CA

505 Montgomery St., Ste. 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111

Allyson Theresa Fortier

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP - Los Angeles, CA

350 S Grand Ave., Ste. 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Adam R Prescott

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP - Washington, DC

1875 Pennsylvania Ave. Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Eric P Enson

Attorney at Jones Day - Los Angeles, CA

555 W Flower St., 50Th Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2300

Meghan E Hausler

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie LLP - Dallas, TX

2300 Trammell Crow Ctr., 2001 Ross Ave.

Dallas, TX 75201

John Robert Fornaciari

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP - Washington, DC

1050 Connecticut Ave. Nw, Ste. 1100

Washington, DC 20036

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#73

#72

#71

70 #1

Exhibit 1

#70

69 #1

Exhibit 1

#69

68 #1

Exhibit 1

#68

4 #10

Summons

4 #8

Summons

4 #6

Summons

#4

3 #1

Instructions

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

110 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT of Receipt of Electronic Transfer in the Northern District of California. New Case Number: 3:17-cv-7046. (MAP) (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketRemark: Case Transferred to the Northern District of California via electronic transfer. (MAP) (Entered: 12/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER - Transferring Case to the Northern District of California Re MDL-2801. (MAP) (Entered: 12/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Toshin Kogyo Company Limited. Reason for return: Return to Sender: Undeliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward. Document number 67. (REK) (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Jerry Goldsmith on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Victoria Ann Stazio. (Stazio, Victoria) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Avnet Incorporated: Notice of Service re: Translated Summons, Complaint and USM-94 Form upon Toshin Kogyo Co., Ltd. on 4/17/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wagner, Scott) (Entered: 10/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Avnet Incorporated: Notice of Service re: Translated Summons, Complaint and USM-94 Form upon Nitsuko Electronics Corporation on 5/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wagner, Scott) (Entered: 10/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Avnet Incorporated: Notice of Service re: Translated Summons, Complaint and USM-94 Form upon Nissei Electric Co., Ltd. on 4/17/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wagner, Scott) (Entered: 10/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) ORDER the Joint Motion to Approve Parties' Coordination of Discovery #66 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Motion to Strike #57 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall STRIKE the Motion to Dismiss #56 . Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver on 9/5/17. (CLB) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2016
  • DocketPRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX175512 as to Lori P Lustrin. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lori P Lustrin on behalf of Avnet Incorporated. (BAS) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • DocketPRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX175513 as to Robert W Turken. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Robert W Turken on behalf of Avnet Incorporated. (BAS) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Avnet Incorporated.(submitted by Amy Abdo) (EJA) (Entered: 08/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Cases by Avnet Incorporated.(submitted by Amy Abdo) (EJA) (Entered: 08/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) *SUMMONS Issued as to ELNA America Incorporated, ELNA Company Limited, Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Company America Limited, Hitachi Chemical Company Limited, Holy Stone Enterprise Company Limited, Matsuo Electric Company Limited, Milestone Global Technology Incorporated, Nissei Electric Company Limited, Nitsuko Electronics Corporation, Okaya Electric America Incorporated, Okaya Electric Industries Company Limited, Shinyei Capacitor Company Limited, Shinyei Corporation of America Incorporated, Shinyei Kaisha, Shinyei Technology Company Limited, Shizuki Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated, Taitsu America Incorporated, Taitsu Corporation, Toshin Kogyo Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons)(EJA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. *Modified to correct event and docket text on 8/23/2016 (REK)/(SCH). (Entered: 08/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13303137. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David K Duncan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-16-02808-PHX-DKD. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Instructions)(EJA) (Entered: 08/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Avnet Incorporated.(submitted by Amy Abdo) (EJA) (Entered: 08/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13303137 filed by Avnet Incorporated.(submitted by Amy Abdo) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(EJA) (Entered: 08/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd. is a litigant