This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2018 at 08:01:36 (UTC).

ADVANCED FRAUD SOLUTIONS, LLC V. CORE TECHS, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2017 ADVANCED FRAUD SOLUTIONS, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against CORE TECHS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are LORETTA C. BIGGS and L. PATRICK AULD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-01080

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LORETTA C. BIGGS

Referral Judge

L. PATRICK AULD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADVANCED FRAUD SOLUTIONS, LLC

Defendant

CORE TECHS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JEFFREY DEAN PATTON

Attorney at SPILMAN THOMAS & BATTLE PLLC

110 Oakwood Dr., Ste. 500

Winston-Salem, NC 27103

ASHLEE A. WEBSTER

Attorney at SPILMAN THOMAS & BATTLE, PLLC

110 Oakwood Dr., Ste. 500

Winston-Salem, NC 27103

Defendant Attorneys

JENNIFER K. VAN ZANT

Attorney at BROOKS PIERCE MCLENDON HUMPHREY & LEONARD

Pob 26000

Greensboro, NC 27420-6000

CLINTON SHEPARD MORSE

Attorney at BROOKS PIERCE MCLENDON HUMPHREY & LEONARD

Pob 26000

Greensboro, NC 27420-6000

MATTHEW B. TYNAN

Attorney at BROOKS PIERCE MCLENDON HUMPHREY & LEONARD

Pob 26000

Greensboro, NC 27420-6000

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

16 #2

Exhibit B; Kress Affidavit

16 #1

Exhibit A; 2nd Reaves Affidavit

#16

#15

14 #15

Exhibit 15

14 #14

Exhibit 14

#10

#6

5 #1

Consent Form

#5

#4

#2

1 #3

Exhibit C - TrueCards Trademark Registration

1 #2

Exhibit B - TrueChecks Trademark Registration

1 #1

Exhibit A - Master Services Agreement

#1

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Submitted: #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie) (Entered: 01/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) BRIEF re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (TYNAN, MATTHEW) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CORE TECHS, INC.. Response to Motion due by 2/12/2018 (TYNAN, MATTHEW) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPLY, filed by Plaintiff ADVANCED FRAUD SOLUTIONS, LLC, to Response to #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery filed by ADVANCED FRAUD SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A; 2nd Reaves Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B; Kress Affidavit)(PATTON, JEFFREY) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery filed by ADVANCED FRAUD SOLUTIONS, LLC filed by CORE TECHS, INC.. Replies due by 1/23/2018 (MORSE, CLINTON) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DECLARATION filed by Defendant CORE TECHS, INC. re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery Declaration of Bobby Davis filed by CORE TECHS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(MORSE, CLINTON) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ASHLEE A. WEBSTER on behalf of Plaintiff ADVANCED FRAUD SOLUTIONS, LLC (WEBSTER, ASHLEE) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MATTHEW B. TYNAN on behalf of Defendant CORE TECHS, INC. (TYNAN, MATTHEW) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff ADVANCED FRAUD SOLUTIONS, LLC re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery filed by ADVANCED FRAUD SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Lawrence Reaves with exhibits)(PATTON, JEFFREY) (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery by ADVANCED FRAUD SOLUTIONS, LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/9/2018 (PATTON, JEFFREY) (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for CORE TECHS, INC. Answer due by 1/25/2018. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/11/2017. (Brubaker, John) (Entered: 12/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by CORE TECHS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(VAN ZANT, JENNIFER) (Entered: 12/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CORE TECHS, INC. (VAN ZANT, JENNIFER) (Entered: 12/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JENNIFER K. VAN ZANT on behalf of Defendant CORE TECHS, INC. (VAN ZANT, JENNIFER) (Entered: 12/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to CORE TECHS, INC. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. set flag for Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advanced Fraud Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ALLEGACY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, Corporate Parent Core Techs, Inc., Corporate Parent Allegacy Services, LLC, Corporate Parent Professional League Resources, Inc., Corporate Parent Carolinas Credit Union League for Advanced Fraud Solutions, LLC.. (PATTON, JEFFREY) (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Core Techs, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2249943.), filed by Advanced Fraud Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master Services Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - TrueChecks Trademark Registration, #3 Exhibit C - TrueCards Trademark Registration)(PATTON, JEFFREY) (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clinton Shepperd Morse

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew B. Tynan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer K Van Zant