This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/20/2018 at 16:02:06 (UTC).

Avalos v. BitConnect International PLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2018 Avalos filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against BitConnect International PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-01165

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Baltazar Avalos

Defendants

Ryan Maasen

BitConnect Trading Ltd.

BitConnect Ltd.

Ryan Hildreth

Joshua Jeppesen

Trevon Brown a/k/a Trevon James

BitConnect International PLC

John Doe No. 1 a/k/a Nicholas Trovato a/k/a Cryptonick

Craig Grant

Glenn Arcaro

Trevon Brown

John Doe No. 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosemary M. Rivas

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky LLP

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 650

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Baltazar Avalos (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 3/14/2018) (Entered: 03/14/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/26/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Glenn Arcaro, BitConnect International PLC, BitConnect Ltd., BitConnect Trading Ltd., Trevon Brown, Craig Grant, Ryan Hildreth, Joshua Jeppesen, John Doe No. 1, Ryan Maasen. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

6 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#6

(#6) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras SEC Class Action Notice due by 3/15/2018. Case Management Statement due by 5/18/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Baltazar Avalos re #1 Complaint, of Certification of Plaintiff Pursuant to Federal Securities Laws (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 2/22/2018) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Baltazar Avalos (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 2/22/2018) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 2/22/2018) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Violation of Section 12(a)(1) and 15(a) of the Securities Act of 1933; Violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code Sections 17200 et seq.; Breach of Contract; Actual Fraud; Constructive Fraud; and Unjust Enrichment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12133366.). Filed byBaltazar Avalos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 2/22/2018) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Baltazar Avalos (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 3/14/2018) (Entered: 03/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/26/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Glenn Arcaro, BitConnect International PLC, BitConnect Ltd., BitConnect Trading Ltd., Trevon Brown, Craig Grant, Ryan Hildreth, Joshua Jeppesen, John Doe No. 1, Ryan Maasen. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras SEC Class Action Notice due by 3/15/2018. Case Management Statement due by 5/18/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • (#5) Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2018) (Entered: 02/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Baltazar Avalos re #1 Complaint, of Certification of Plaintiff Pursuant to Federal Securities Laws (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 2/22/2018) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Baltazar Avalos (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 2/22/2018) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 2/22/2018) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Violation of Section 12(a)(1) and 15(a) of the Securities Act of 1933; Violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code Sections 17200 et seq.; Breach of Contract; Actual Fraud; Constructive Fraud; and Unjust Enrichment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12133366.). Filed byBaltazar Avalos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 2/22/2018) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bitconnect Trading LTD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosemary M. Rivas