This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/17/2015 at 01:18:56 (UTC).

Automotive Constant Velocity Joint Boot Products

Case Summary

On 05/01/2014 Automotive Constant Velocity Joint Boot Products was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mona K. Majzoub and Marianne O. Battani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-02900

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mona K. Majzoub

Presiding Judge

Marianne O. Battani

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Farrell Alena

Apex Motor Corporation

Archer-Perdue, Inc.

Gregory Asken

Melissa Barron

Beck Motors, Inc.

Kimberly Bennett

David Bernstein

Bonneville and Son, Inc.

Tenisha Burgos

Kent Busek

Cannon Chevrolet-Oldmobile-Cadillac-Nissan, Inc.

Capitol Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc.

Capitol Dealerships, Inc.

Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC

Charles Daher's Commonwealth Motors Inc.

Jennifer Chase

Commonwealth Nissan, Inc

Commonwealth Volkswagen, Inc.

Rita Cornish

84 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

E. Powell Miller

Attorney at The Miller Law Firm

950 W. University Drive, Suite 300

Rochester, MI 48307

Bernard Persky

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

601 Lexington Ave, Suite 3400

New York, NY 10022-4611

William Reiss

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

601 Lexington Ave

New York, NY 10022-4611

Hollis L Salzman

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

601 Lexington Avenue, Suite 3400

New York, NY 10022

Brendan H. Frey

Attorney at Mantese Honigman Rossman & Williamson, P.C.

1361 E. Big Beaver Road

Troy, MI 48083

Gerard V. Mantese

Attorney at Mantese Assoc.

1361 E. Big Beaver Road

Troy, MI 48083

David F. Hansma

Attorney at Mantese and Rossman

1361 E. Big Beaver Road

Troy, MI 48083

Joshua Paul Lushnat

Attorney at Mantese Honigman Rossman & Williamson, P.C.

1361 E. Big Beaver Road

Troy, MI 48083

Christopher Micheletti - MDL NOT ADMITTED

Attorney at Zelle Hofmann Voelbel & Mason

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 3400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other Attorneys

Yifei Li

Attorney at Cuneo Gilbert & LaDuca, LLP

507 C Street Ne

Washington, DC 20002

Victoria Romanenko

Attorney at Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca

507 C Street Ne

Washington, DC 20002

Warren T. Burns

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 5100

Dallas, TX 75202

Adam T. Schnatz

Attorney at The Miller Law Firm

950 W. University Drive, Suite 300

Rochester, MI 48307

Marc M. Seltzer

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 950

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6029

Steven G. Sklaver - NOT SWORN

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 950

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Steven N. Williams

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

David C. Giardina

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

One South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Zachary A. Madonia

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

One South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Courtney Ann Rosen

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

One South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Angelo J. Suozzi

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

One South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#27

#24

#25

#26

#23

#22

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#19

#20

#21

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan W. Cuneo on behalf of Dealership Plaintiffs. (Cuneo, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Yifei Li on behalf of Dealership Plaintiffs. (Li, Yifei) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Romanenko on behalf of Dealership Plaintiffs. (Romanenko, Victoria) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joshua Paul Lushnat appearing on behalf of Apex Motor Corporation, Archer-Perdue, Inc., Beck Motors, Inc., Cannon Chevrolet-Oldmobile-Cadillac-Nissan, Inc., Capitol Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc., Capitol Dealerships, Inc., Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC, Charles Daher's Commonwealth Motors Inc., Commonwealth Nissan, Inc, Commonwealth Volkswagen, Inc., Dale Martens Nissan Subaru, Inc, Dave Heather Corporation, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Empire Nissan of Santa Rosa, LLC, Green Team of Clay Center Inc., HC Acquisition, LLC, Hammett Motor Company, Inc, Hartley Buick GMC Truck, Inc, Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc, Hodges Imported Cars, Inc., Holzhauer Auto and Truck Sales, Inc., Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, John Greene Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Landers Auto Group No. 1, Inc., Landers of Hazelwood, LLC, Lee Auto Malls-Topsham Inc., Lee Oldsmobile Cadillac, Inc., Lee Pontiac-Oldsmobile-GMC Truck, Inc., Little Rock CDJ, Inc., Martens Cars of Washington, Inc, McGrath Automotive Group, Inc., Panama City Automotive Group, Inc., Patsy Lou Chevrolet, Inc., Pitre, Inc., Rainbow Chevrolet, Inc., Ramey Motors, Inc, Reno Dodge Sales, Inc., SLT Group II, Inc, Scotland Car Yard Enterprises, Shearer Automotive Enterprises III, Inc., Stoebner Holdings, Inc, Stranger Investments, Superstore Automotive, Inc, Table Rock Automotive, Inc, Thornhill Superstore, Inc, V.I.P. Motor Cars Ltd., Westfield Dodge City, Inc. (Lushnat, Joshua) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David F. Hansma appearing on behalf of Apex Motor Corporation, Archer-Perdue, Inc., Beck Motors, Inc., Bonneville and Son, Inc., Cannon Chevrolet-Oldmobile-Cadillac-Nissan, Inc., Capitol Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc., Capitol Dealerships, Inc., Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC, Charles Daher's Commonwealth Motors Inc., Commonwealth Nissan, Inc, Commonwealth Volkswagen, Inc., Dale Martens Nissan Subaru, Inc, Dave Heather Corporation, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Empire Nissan of Santa Rosa, LLC, Green Team of Clay Center Inc., HC Acquisition, LLC, Hammett Motor Company, Inc, Hartley Buick GMC Truck, Inc, Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc, Hodges Imported Cars, Inc., Holzhauer Auto and Truck Sales, Inc., Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, John Greene Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Landers Auto Group No. 1, Inc., Landers of Hazelwood, LLC, Lee Auto Malls-Topsham Inc., Lee Oldsmobile Cadillac, Inc., Lee Pontiac-Oldsmobile-GMC Truck, Inc., Little Rock CDJ, Inc., Martens Cars of Washington, Inc, McGrath Automotive Group, Inc., Panama City Automotive Group, Inc., Patsy Lou Chevrolet, Inc., Pitre, Inc., Rainbow Chevrolet, Inc., Ramey Motors, Inc, Reno Dodge Sales, Inc., SLT Group II, Inc, Scotland Car Yard Enterprises, Shearer Automotive Enterprises III, Inc., Stoebner Holdings, Inc, Stranger Investments, Superstore Automotive, Inc, Table Rock Automotive, Inc, Thornhill Superstore, Inc, V.I.P. Motor Cars Ltd., Westfield Dodge City, Inc. (Hansma, David) (Entered: 02/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Murad on behalf of Toyo Automotive Parts (USA), Inc., Toyo Tire & Rubber Co., Ltd., Toyo Tire North America Manufacturing Inc., Toyo Tire North America OE Sales LLC. (Murad, Adam) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Angelo J. Suozzi on behalf of Toyo Automotive Parts (USA), Inc., Toyo Tire & Rubber Co., Ltd., Toyo Tire North America Manufacturing Inc., Toyo Tire North America OE Sales LLC. (Suozzi, Angelo) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary A. Madonia on behalf of Toyo Automotive Parts (USA), Inc., Toyo Tire & Rubber Co., Ltd., Toyo Tire North America Manufacturing Inc., Toyo Tire North America OE Sales LLC. (Madonia, Zachary) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Ann Rosen on behalf of Toyo Automotive Parts (USA), Inc., Toyo Tire & Rubber Co., Ltd., Toyo Tire North America Manufacturing Inc., Toyo Tire North America OE Sales LLC. (Rosen, Courtney) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Toyo Tire & Rubber Co., Ltd. (Giardina, David) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE by Dealership Plaintiffs of Intent to File Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint and Add New Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Mantese, Gerard) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan H. Frey on behalf of Dealership Plaintiffs. (Frey, Brendan) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Micheletti - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Jennifer Chase, Roger Olson, Darrel Senior, Phillip Young. (Micheletti - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Christopher) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven G. Sklaver - NOT SWORN on behalf of End-Payor Plaintiffs. (Sklaver - NOT SWORN, Steven) (Entered: 10/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of End-Payor Plaintiffs. (Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Warren T. Burns on behalf of End-Payor Plaintiffs. (Burns, Warren) (Entered: 10/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Steven N. Williams appearing on behalf of End-Payor Plaintiffs (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by William Reiss on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Reiss, William) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard Persky on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Persky, Bernard) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Appearance by Hollis L Salzman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Salzman, Hollis) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Commonwealth Volkswagen, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Capitol Dealerships, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Charles Dahers Commonwealth Motors, Inc. is a litigant