This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2018 at 07:45:18 (UTC).

Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Wethington Insurance, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/17/2018 Auto-Owners Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Wethington Insurance, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William O. Bertelsman and Candace J. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00123

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William O. Bertelsman

Referral Judge

Candace J. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Defendant

Wethington Insurance, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christine D. Campbell

Attorney at Schiller Barnes Maloney PLLC

401 W. Main Street, One River Front Plaza, Suite 1600

Louisville, KY 40202

David K. Barnes

Attorney at Schiller Barnes Maloney PLLC

401 W. Main Street, One River Front Plaza, Suite 1600

Louisville, KY 40202

Defendant Attorney

David Eugene Crittenden

Attorney at Boehl, Stopher & Graves - Louisville KY

400 W. Market Street, 2300 Aegon Center

Louisville, KY 40202-3345

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER: That plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before July 27, 2018, correcting this deficiency re #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 7/19/2018.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, David Crittenden. #9 Answer to Complaint has been filed by Wethington Insurance, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (ECO) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wethington Insurance, LLC, filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Agency Contract, #2 Summons)(Barnes, David) Modified text to correctly describe exhibit on 7/19/2018 (ECO). (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#9

(#9) FIRST ANSWER to Complaint by Wethington Insurance, LLC.(Crittenden, David) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4121930), filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Agency Contract, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to be issued)(ECO) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

#5

(#5) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 07/17/2018)

7 #1

Exhibit Ex. A-Agency Contract

#4

(#4) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Auto-Owners Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Group for Auto-Owners Insurance Company.. (ECO) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Wethington Insurance, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically re: Amended Complaint #7 (ECO) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Wethington Insurance, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

#13

(#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Barnes, David) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

1 #3

Summons to be issued

#11

(#11) FIRST FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wethington Insurance, LLC. (Crittenden, David) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER: That said DOCKET CALL is set for 9/19/2018 at 01:00 PM to be held at the United States Courthouse, 35 West Fifth Street, Covington, Kentucky in the 5th Floor Court before Judge William O. Bertelsman. the parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order at least three (3) days before docket call. Counsel must attend the docket call in person and be sufficiently familiar with the case to answer any inquiries the Court may have. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 8/23/2018.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 08/23/2018)

7 #2

Summons

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: #13 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (TJZ) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Barnes, David) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER: That said DOCKET CALL is set for 9/19/2018 at 01:00 PM to be held at the United States Courthouse, 35 West Fifth Street, Covington, Kentucky in the 5th Floor Court before Judge William O. Bertelsman. the parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order at least three (3) days before docket call. Counsel must attend the docket call in person and be sufficiently familiar with the case to answer any inquiries the Court may have. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 8/23/2018.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) FIRST FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wethington Insurance, LLC. (Crittenden, David) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, David Crittenden. #9 Answer to Complaint has been filed by Wethington Insurance, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (ECO) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FIRST ANSWER to Complaint by Wethington Insurance, LLC.(Crittenden, David) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Wethington Insurance, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically re: Amended Complaint #7 (ECO) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO David Barnes re #7 Amended Complaint; Error: attachment was insufficiently described as Exhibit A. Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (ECO) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wethington Insurance, LLC, filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Agency Contract, #2 Summons)(Barnes, David) Modified text to correctly describe exhibit on 7/19/2018 (ECO). (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: That plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before July 27, 2018, correcting this deficiency re #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 7/19/2018.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (ECO) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Auto-Owners Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Group for Auto-Owners Insurance Company.. (ECO) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Wethington Insurance, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4121930), filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Agency Contract, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to be issued)(ECO) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.