This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2018 at 07:44:38 (UTC).

Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Series C of NP Road Partners, LLC et al (JRG1)

Case Summary

On 08/28/2018 Auto-Owners Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Series C of NP Road Partners, LLC JRG1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J Ronnie Greer and H Bruce Guyton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00355

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J Ronnie Greer

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Defendants

Chander Bhateja

Series C of NP Road Partners, LLC

TN Oak Ridge Rutgers, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dean Thomas Howell

Attorney at Woolf, McClane, Bright, Allen & Carpenter, PLLC

P O Box 900, 900 S. Gay Street

Knoxville, TN 37901

April Adams Carr

Attorney at Woolf, McClane, Bright, Allen & Carpenter, PLLC

P O Box 900, 900 S. Gay Street

Knoxville, TN 37901

Howard E Jarvis

Attorney at Woolf, McClane, Bright, Allen & Carpenter, PLLC

P O Box 900, 900 S. Gay Street

Knoxville, TN 37901

Defendant Attorneys

Wesley Edward Shipe

Attorney at Howard & Howard, PC

4820 Old Kingston Pike

Knoxville, TN 37919

Reggie E Keaton

Attorney at Frantz, McConnell & Seymour

P O Box 39

Knoxville, TN 37901-0039

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) MOTION to Stay Case or, Alternatively, for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Chander Bhateja, Series C of NP Road Partners, LLC. (Shipe, Wesley) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion to Stay or, Alternatively, for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that Series C and Mr. Bahteja request an extension of time to file a responsive pleading. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. See Clinton v. Jones, 520 U.S. 681, 683 (1997) (stating that a district court has broad discretion in determining whether to stay a case, as an incident to its power to control its own docket (citation omitted)). Series C and Mr. Bahteja SHALL file an answer, or otherwise respond under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b), within twenty-one days from the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/24/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#12

(#12) Certificate of Corporate Interest by TN Oak Ridge Rutgers, LLC. (Keaton, Reggie) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - June 29, 2017 Email from Mark Watson of City of Oak Ridge to Bhateja

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - July 12, 2017 Email from Kathryn Baldwin of City of Oak Ridge to Bha

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - July 31, 2017 Email from Bhateja to to Arnold Blackwell of City of O

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - July 31, 2017 Email from Bhateja to Arnold Blackwell of City of Oak

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint in underlying action

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Bhateja's Application for Policy of Insurance

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Auto-Owners Insurance Co. Policy

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Chander Bhateja, Series C of NP Road Partners, LLC, TN Oak Ridge Rutgers, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3755349.), filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint in underlying action, #2 Exhibit 2 - Bhateja's Application for Policy of Insurance, #3 Exhibit 3 - Auto-Owners Insurance Co. Policy, #4 Exhibit 4 - June 29, 2017 Email from Mark Watson of City of Oak Ridge to Bhateja, #5 Exhibit 5 - July 12, 2017 Email from Kathryn Baldwin of City of Oak Ridge to Bhateja, #6 Exhibit 6 - July 31, 2017 Email from Bhateja to to Arnold Blackwell of City of Oak Ridge, #7 Exhibit 7 - July 31, 2017 Email from Bhateja to Arnold Blackwell of City of Oak Ridge, #8 Exhibit 8 - July 20, 2017 Email from Bhateja to Roger Flynn and Brian Mills of City of Oak Ridge, #9 Summons to Series C of NP Road Partners, LLC, #10 Summons to Chander Bhateja, #11 Summons to TN Oak Ridge Rutgers, LLC, #12 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Howell, Dean) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

1 #8

Exhibit 8 - July 20, 2017 Email from Bhateja to Roger Flynn and Brian Mills of C

1 #9

Summons to Series C of NP Road Partners, LLC

#11

(#11) TN Oak Ridge Rutgers, LLC ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, for Declaratory Judgment by TN Oak Ridge Rutgers, LLC.(Keaton, Reggie) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

1 #12

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Summons to Chander Bhateja

1 #11

Summons to TN Oak Ridge Rutgers, LLC

#10

(#10) STIPULATION OF PARTIES by TN Oak Ridge Rutgers, LLC. (Keaton, Reggie) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion to Stay or, Alternatively, for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that Series C and Mr. Bahteja request an extension of time to file a responsive pleading. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. See Clinton v. Jones, 520 U.S. 681, 683 (1997) (stating that a district court has broad discretion in determining whether to stay a case, as an incident to its power to control its own docket (citation omitted)). Series C and Mr. Bahteja SHALL file an answer, or otherwise respond under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b), within twenty-one days from the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/24/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Stay Case or, Alternatively, for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Chander Bhateja, Series C of NP Road Partners, LLC. (Shipe, Wesley) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Certificate of Corporate Interest by TN Oak Ridge Rutgers, LLC. (Keaton, Reggie) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by TN Oak Ridge Rutgers, LLC. (JBR) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) TN Oak Ridge Rutgers, LLC ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, for Declaratory Judgment by TN Oak Ridge Rutgers, LLC.(Keaton, Reggie) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION OF PARTIES by TN Oak Ridge Rutgers, LLC. (Keaton, Reggie) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Chander Bhateja served on 9/7/2018. (Carr, April) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Series C of NP Road Partners, LLC served on 9/7/2018. (Carr, April) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. TN Oak Ridge Rutgers, LLC served on 9/6/2018. (Carr, April) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/30/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/30/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/30/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Chander Bhateja, Series C of NP Road Partners, LLC, TN Oak Ridge Rutgers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DJH, ) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Howell, Dean) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Chander Bhateja, Series C of NP Road Partners, LLC, TN Oak Ridge Rutgers, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3755349.), filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint in underlying action, #2 Exhibit 2 - Bhateja's Application for Policy of Insurance, #3 Exhibit 3 - Auto-Owners Insurance Co. Policy, #4 Exhibit 4 - June 29, 2017 Email from Mark Watson of City of Oak Ridge to Bhateja, #5 Exhibit 5 - July 12, 2017 Email from Kathryn Baldwin of City of Oak Ridge to Bhateja, #6 Exhibit 6 - July 31, 2017 Email from Bhateja to to Arnold Blackwell of City of Oak Ridge, #7 Exhibit 7 - July 31, 2017 Email from Bhateja to Arnold Blackwell of City of Oak Ridge, #8 Exhibit 8 - July 20, 2017 Email from Bhateja to Roger Flynn and Brian Mills of City of Oak Ridge, #9 Summons to Series C of NP Road Partners, LLC, #10 Summons to Chander Bhateja, #11 Summons to TN Oak Ridge Rutgers, LLC, #12 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Howell, Dean) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.