This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:36:28 (UTC).

Auto-Owners Insurance Company et al v. Gene Wingate et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Auto-Owners Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Gene Wingate. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony E. Porcelli, Steven D. Merryday and William F. Jung. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-02115

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anthony E. Porcelli

Presiding Judges

Steven D. Merryday

William F. Jung

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Owners Insurance Company

Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Tina Dukes

Chad Dukes

Gene Wingate

Wingate's Tractor Service, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Defendants

Tina Dukes

Florida Power and Light Company

Chad Dukes

Gene Wingate

Wingate's Tractor Service, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Florida Power and Light Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

William S. Chambers, IV

Attorney at Valenti, Campbell, Trohn, Tamayo & Aranda, PA

Po Box 2369

Lakeland, FL 33806-2369

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Eric Rowland Hoecker

Attorney at Florida Power & Light Company

Suite Hrm/Jb, 700 Universe Blvd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Florida Power and Light Company. Related case(s): Yes (Hoecker, Eric) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#22

(#22) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Auto-Owners Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Owners Insurance Company for Auto-Owners Insurance Company.. (Chambers, William) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#21

(#21) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Auto-Owners Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Company for Auto-Owners Insurance Company.. (Chambers, William) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Chambers, William) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#19

(#19) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Florida Power and Light Company identifying Corporate Parent NextEra Energy Inc for Florida Power and Light Company.. (Hoecker, Eric) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#6

(#6) ***TERMINATED***SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Auto-Owners Insurance Company as to Gene Wingate. (Chambers, William) Modified on 9/5/2018 (CTR). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

5 #4

Exhibit D

5 #3

Exhibit C

5 #2

Exhibit B

#5

(#18) Florida Power & Light Company's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #5 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Chad Dukes, Tina Dukes, Gene Wingate, Owners Insurance Company, Wingate's Tractor Service, Inc. by Florida Power and Light Company.(Hoecker, Eric) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER re #2 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/27/2018. (GSO) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#2

(#3) ORDER re #2 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/27/2018. (GSO) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 4 ***COMPLAINT against Chad Dukes, Tina Dukes, Florida Power and Light Company, Gene Wingate, Wingate's Tractor Service, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA052684) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(EA) Modified on 8/28/2018 (CTR). (Entered: 08/24/2018)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Florida Power and Light Company. Related case(s): Yes (Hoecker, Eric) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Auto-Owners Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Owners Insurance Company for Auto-Owners Insurance Company.. (Chambers, William) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Auto-Owners Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Company for Auto-Owners Insurance Company.. (Chambers, William) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Chambers, William) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Florida Power and Light Company identifying Corporate Parent NextEra Energy Inc for Florida Power and Light Company.. (Hoecker, Eric) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Florida Power & Light Company's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #5 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Chad Dukes, Tina Dukes, Gene Wingate, Owners Insurance Company, Wingate's Tractor Service, Inc. by Florida Power and Light Company.(Hoecker, Eric) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RETURN of service executed on 09/24/2018 by Auto-Owners Insurance Company as to Florida Power and Light Company. (Chambers, William) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • (#16) Case Reassigned to Judge William F. Jung. New case number: 8:18-cv-2115-T-02AEP. Judge Steven D. Merryday no longer assigned to the case. (AG) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS issued as to Tina Dukes. (CTR) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS issued as to Chad Dukes. (CTR) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ***TERMINATED***SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Auto-Owners Insurance Company as to Tina Dukes. (Chambers, William) Modified on 9/5/2018 (CTR). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ***TERMINATED***SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Auto-Owners Insurance Company as to Chad Dukes. (Chambers, William) Modified on 9/5/2018 (CTR). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ***TERMINATED***SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Auto-Owners Insurance Company as to Florida Power and Light Company. (Chambers, William) Modified on 9/5/2018 (CTR). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ***TERMINATED***SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Auto-Owners Insurance Company as to Wingate's Tractor Service, Inc.. (Chambers, William) Modified on 9/5/2018 (CTR). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ***TERMINATED***SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Auto-Owners Insurance Company as to Gene Wingate. (Chambers, William) Modified on 9/5/2018 (CTR). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Chambers, William) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • (#4) ENDORSED ORDER: The complaint (Doc. 1) is STRICKEN for failure to double-space the text in accord with Local Rule 1.05(a). Counsel must acquire a command of the rules governing practice in the Middle District of Florida or risk incurring a sanction for wasting the resources of the participants in this action. No later than September 3, 2018, the plaintiff may amend the complaint to comply with applicable rules. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/27/2018. (Merryday, Steven) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER re #2 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/27/2018. (GSO) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 4 ***COMPLAINT against Chad Dukes, Tina Dukes, Florida Power and Light Company, Gene Wingate, Wingate's Tractor Service, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA052684) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(EA) Modified on 8/28/2018 (CTR). (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less