This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2018 at 05:17:50 (UTC).

Authenticom, Inc. v. CDK Global, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2018 Authenticom, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against CDK Global, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J. St. Eve. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00868

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy J. St. Eve

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Authenticom, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

The Reynolds and Reynolds Company

CDK Global, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Derek Tam Ho

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M St. N.W., Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Joshua Hafenbrack

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Kevin J. Miller

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Jennifer L. Gregor

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn SC

One East Main Street, Suite 500

Madison, WI 53703

David L. Schwarz

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Michael N. Nemelka

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Allison W Reimann

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn

One East Main Street, Ste. 500

Madison, WI 53701

Daniel V. Dorris

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Brian T. Ross

1100 Louisiana Street, Suite 5300

Houston, TX 77002

Jesse Jonas Bair

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1 East Main Street, Suite 201

Madison, WI 53703

Brandon M. Lewis

Attorney at Perkins Coie

Suite 201, 1 East Main Street

Madison, WI 53703

Aundrea Kristine Gulley

Attorney at Gibbs & Bruns, L.L.P.

1100 Louisiana, Suite 5300

Houston, TX 77002

John S. Skilton

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

One East Main Street, Suite 201

Madison, WI 53703

Charles Grant Curtis, Jr.

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1 East Main Street, Suite 201

Madison, WI 53703

Michelle M. Umberger

Attorney at Perkins Coie Llp

One East Main Street, #201

Madison, WI 53703

Kathy D. Patrick

1100 Louisiana, Suite 5300

Houston, TX 77002

Kathleen A. Stetsko

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

131 S. Dearborn St., Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60603

Amar Shrinivas Naik

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4106

Jeffrey Allan Simmons

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

150 East Gilman Street, P.O. Box 1497

Madison, WI 53701-1497

Joseph S Harper

Attorney at Foley & Lardner

150 East Gilman St., P.O. Box 1497

Madison, WI 53701

12 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#249

(#249) MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all Counsel of Record. (jjr, ) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

248 #1

*Restricted*

#248

(#248) RECEIVED from Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:17-cv-00318 (jjr) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

247 #1

Transmittal Letter

#247

(#247) Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order. Case closed. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair of the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 2/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (kwf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 02/02/2018)

#246

(#246) Conditional Transfer Order (Copy). Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair of the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 2/1/2018. (kwf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 02/01/2018)

#245

(#245) ORDER granting #231 Motion for Partial Stay of Discovery. Depositions, discovery related to electronically-stored information, and all court deadlines are STAYED until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the pending motion to consolidate this case with several other similar cases. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/12/2018. (kwf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

#244

(#244) Notice by Defendants CDK Global, LLC, The Reynolds and Reynolds Company re: #231 Motion for Partial Stay of Discovery. Supplemental Submission of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Partial Stay of Duplicative Discovery Pending Pretrial Consolidation of Related Matter, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2018-01-10 Authenticom 30(b)(6) Notice to CDK, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2018-01-10 Authenticom 30(b)(6) Notice to Reynolds) (Umberger, Michelle) Modified on 1/11/2018. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#231

(#242) Brief in Reply by Defendants CDK Global, LLC, The Reynolds and Reynolds Company, in Support of #231 Motion to Stay. (Umberger, Michelle) Modified on 1/10/2018. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to CDK Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to The Reynolds and Reynolds Company) (kwf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 05/02/2017)

#5

(#8) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The court is in receipt of plaintiff Authenticom, Inc.'s emergency motion for status conference and preliminary injunction schedule (dkt. #5 ), which will be DENIED without prejudice. While the court appreciates the advanced warning of plaintiff's planned filing of a motion for preliminary injunction, it would be premature to schedule a status conference or to set a briefing schedule or a hearing date until the motion and supporting documents are filed pursuant to the court's #Procedure to be followed on Motions for Injunctive Relief. Once filed, the court will determine the appropriate briefing schedule and whether a status conference is required. In the meantime, plaintiff should serve the complaint as soon as possible. Likewise, once plaintiff files its planned preliminary injunction motion, plaintiff should immediately serve that motion and all supporting materials, as the briefing schedule will depend, at least in part, on the date and manner of service of that motion on defendants. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/2/2017. (kwf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 05/02/2017)

4 #3

Summons to The Reynolds and Reynolds Company

4 #2

Summons to CDK Global, LLC

4 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) Redaction to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Authenticom, Inc., (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to CDK Global, LLC, #3 Summons to The Reynolds and Reynolds Company) (Gregor, Jennifer) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2017)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Authenticom, Inc. (Gregor, Jennifer) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2017)

#2

(#2) Motion to Seal by Plaintiff Authenticom, Inc. (Gregor, Jennifer) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2017)

420 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#249) MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all Counsel of Record. (jjr, ) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#248) RECEIVED from Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:17-cv-00318 (jjr) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#247) Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order. Case closed. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair of the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 2/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (kwf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#246) Conditional Transfer Order (Copy). Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair of the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 2/1/2018. (kwf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 02/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#245) ORDER granting #231 Motion for Partial Stay of Discovery. Depositions, discovery related to electronically-stored information, and all court deadlines are STAYED until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the pending motion to consolidate this case with several other similar cases. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/12/2018. (kwf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#244) Notice by Defendants CDK Global, LLC, The Reynolds and Reynolds Company re: #231 Motion for Partial Stay of Discovery. Supplemental Submission of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Partial Stay of Duplicative Discovery Pending Pretrial Consolidation of Related Matter, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2018-01-10 Authenticom 30(b)(6) Notice to CDK, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2018-01-10 Authenticom 30(b)(6) Notice to Reynolds) (Umberger, Michelle) Modified on 1/11/2018. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#243) Declaration of Michelle M. Umberger filed by Defendants CDK Global, LLC, The Reynolds and Reynolds Company re: #231 Motion to Stay, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2017-12-08 Nemelka Letter re: Custodians and Search Terms, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2017-11-24 Nemelka Letter to Defendants, #3 Exhibit 3 - Allergan Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Cox Automotive Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2018-01-03 Hafenbrack Email to Defendants, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2017-12-22 Hafenbrack Email re: Ghaben, #7 Exhibit 7 - 2017-12-22 Hafenbrack Email re: Autoloop, #8 Exhibit 8 - 2017-12-21 Hafenbrack Email re: Open Recalls, #9 Exhibit 9 - 2017-12-19 Dorris Email re: Cox Automotive) (Umberger, Michelle) Modified on 1/10/2018. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#242) Brief in Reply by Defendants CDK Global, LLC, The Reynolds and Reynolds Company, in Support of #231 Motion to Stay. (Umberger, Michelle) Modified on 1/10/2018. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#241) Disregard. See #243 . Modified on 1/10/2018. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#240) Disregard. See #242 . Modified on 1/10/2018. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
245 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The court is in receipt of plaintiff Authenticom, Inc.'s emergency motion for status conference and preliminary injunction schedule (dkt. #5 ), which will be DENIED without prejudice. While the court appreciates the advanced warning of plaintiff's planned filing of a motion for preliminary injunction, it would be premature to schedule a status conference or to set a briefing schedule or a hearing date until the motion and supporting documents are filed pursuant to the court's #Procedure to be followed on Motions for Injunctive Relief. Once filed, the court will determine the appropriate briefing schedule and whether a status conference is required. In the meantime, plaintiff should serve the complaint as soon as possible. Likewise, once plaintiff files its planned preliminary injunction motion, plaintiff should immediately serve that motion and all supporting materials, as the briefing schedule will depend, at least in part, on the date and manner of service of that motion on defendants. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/2/2017. (kwf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 05/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER of Recusal. District Judge Barbara B. Crabb recused. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/2/2017. (kwf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 05/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to CDK Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to The Reynolds and Reynolds Company) (kwf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 05/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Standard attachments for District Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 05/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 05/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Emergency Motion for Status Conference and Preliminary Injunction Schedule by Plaintiff Authenticom, Inc. Response due 5/8/2017. (Gregor, Jennifer) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Redaction to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Authenticom, Inc., (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to CDK Global, LLC, #3 Summons to The Reynolds and Reynolds Company) (Gregor, Jennifer) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Authenticom, Inc. (Gregor, Jennifer) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Motion to Seal by Plaintiff Authenticom, Inc. (Gregor, Jennifer) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CDK Global, LLC, The Reynolds and Reynolds Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2017000.) (Sealed Document), filed by Authenticom, Inc., (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to CDK Global, LLC, #3 Summons to The Reynolds and Reynolds Company) (Gregor, Jennifer) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.