This case was last updated from PACER on 10/05/2018 at 08:03:12 (UTC).

Austin, Jeffrey et al v. London Road Rental Center, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2018 Austin, Jeffrey filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against London Road Rental Center, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00603

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Linda Austin

Jeffrey A. Austin

Defendants

AXIS Insurance Company

Superior Rental Center

London Road Rental Center, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles M. Bye

Attorney at Bye, Goff, & Rohde, Ltd

258 Riverside Drive, P.O. Box 167

River Falls, WI 54022

Defendant Attorney

Pamela M. Schmidt

Attorney at Scopelitis, Garvin, Light, Hanson & Feary, P.C.

330 E. Kilbourn Ave., Ste 827

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Stipulation to Amend Caption by Plaintiffs Jeffrey A. Austin, Linda Austin. (Bye, Charles) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#6

(#6) Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Defendants AXIS Insurance Company, Superior Rental Center. (Schmidt, Pamela) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant AXIS Insurance Company. (Schmidt, Pamela) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#7

(#7) Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 11/2/2018. Dispositive Motions due 4/26/2019. Settlement Letters due 8/2/2019. Motions in Limine due 8/23/2019. Response to Motion due 9/6/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 9/30/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/17/2018. (jls) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Application and Order Glonek Approval

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

#4

(#4) Certificate of Service by Defendants AXIS Insurance Company, Superior Rental Center as to #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Schmidt, Pamela) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Request for Substitution

1 #8

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F - Motion for Dismissal, Letter, Proposed Order

1 #4

Exhibit D - Application and Order Thimm Assigned

1 #7

Exhibit G - Order for Dismissal

#8

(#8) Notice by Plaintiffs Jeffrey A. Austin, Linda Austin Requesting Trial Be Held in Eau Claire. (Bye, Charles) Modified on 9/24/2018. (lak) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Superior Rental Center. (Schmidt, Pamela) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

1 #5

Exhibit E - Notice of Appearance

#5

(#5) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendants AXIS Insurance Company, Superior Rental Center. (Schmidt, Pamela) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Douglas County Circuit Court, case number 18-CV-204. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2293687), filed by All Defendants, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Request for Substitution, #3 Exhibit C - Application and Order Glonek Approval, #4 Exhibit D - Application and Order Thimm Assigned, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Appearance, #6 Exhibit F - Motion for Dismissal, Letter, Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit G - Order for Dismissal, #8 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schmidt, Pamela) Modified on 8/7/2018. (lak) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The parties' stipulation to amend the caption (dkt. #9 ) is accepted and entered by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/4/2018. (jls) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Brief in Opposition by Defendants AXIS Insurance Company, Superior Rental Center re: #8 Motion to Hold Trial in Eau Claire filed by Jeffrey A. Austin, Linda Austin. (Schmidt, Pamela) Modified on 9/27/2018. (lak) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Stipulation to Amend Caption by Plaintiffs Jeffrey A. Austin, Linda Austin. (Bye, Charles) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #8 Motion to Hold Trial in Eau Claire. Response due 9/28/2018. (jls) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice by Plaintiffs Jeffrey A. Austin, Linda Austin Requesting Trial Be Held in Eau Claire. (Bye, Charles) Modified on 9/24/2018. (lak) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 11/2/2018. Dispositive Motions due 4/26/2019. Settlement Letters due 8/2/2019. Motions in Limine due 8/23/2019. Response to Motion due 9/6/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 9/30/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/17/2018. (jls) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 9/13/2018 [:10] (skv) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Defendants AXIS Insurance Company, Superior Rental Center. (Schmidt, Pamela) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Set Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendants AXIS Insurance Company, Superior Rental Center. (Schmidt, Pamela) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Service by Defendants AXIS Insurance Company, Superior Rental Center as to #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Schmidt, Pamela) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant AXIS Insurance Company. (Schmidt, Pamela) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Superior Rental Center. (Schmidt, Pamela) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Douglas County Circuit Court, case number 18-CV-204. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2293687), filed by All Defendants, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Request for Substitution, #3 Exhibit C - Application and Order Glonek Approval, #4 Exhibit D - Application and Order Thimm Assigned, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Appearance, #6 Exhibit F - Motion for Dismissal, Letter, Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit G - Order for Dismissal, #8 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schmidt, Pamela) Modified on 8/7/2018. (lak) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.