This case was last updated from PACER on 06/18/2019 at 03:20:43 (UTC).

Aubert v. Central New Mexico Community College et al

Case Summary

On 02/05/2018 Aubert filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Central New Mexico Community College. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laura Fashing, Jerry H. Ritter and William P. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00118

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Laura Fashing

Presiding Judges

Jerry H. Ritter

William P. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laura Aubert

Defendants

Randall Crandall

Rudy Garcia

Craig Venderploeg

Katherine Winograd

Central New Mexico Community College

Karen Montoya

Kristen Coultas-Kay

Katharine Winograd

Craig Vanderploeg

Randolph Crandall

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Susan G. Chappell

Attorney at Susan G. Chappell Law Firm

P.O. Box 424, 1001 Gold Avenue Sw

Albuquerque, NM 87103-0424

Defendant Attorneys

Mary Keleher Castle

Attorney at GermanBurnette & Associates, LLC

11728 Linn Ave. Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87123

Elizabeth L. German

Attorney at GermanBurnette & Associates, LLC

11728 Linn Ave. Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87123

Ann Louise Keith

Attorney at John S Stiff & Associates LLC

400 Gold Sw, #1300 West

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Michael B. Calderon

Attorney at Stiff, Keith & Garcia, LLC

400 Gold Ave. Sw, Suite 1300

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

#56

No Description Available

#39

No Description Available

13 #2

Exhibit B

#67

(#67) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laura Aubert re PL Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Chappell, Susan) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#69

(#69) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Motions due by 12/16/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/18/2020. (cda) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#43

No Description Available

#61

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

#38

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#66

(#66) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laura Aubert re Initial Disclosure Documents (Chappell, Susan) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#31

No Description Available

#50

No Description Available

#55

No Description Available

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#21

No Description Available

#51

No Description Available

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Central New Mexico Community College Defendant CNM's First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production to Plaintiff (German, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a Settlement Conference for 9/24/2019 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Motions due by 12/16/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/18/2020. (cda) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) Clerk's Minutes for Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 5/20/2019 before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laura Aubert re PL Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Chappell, Susan) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laura Aubert re Initial Disclosure Documents (Chappell, Susan) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Laura Aubert (Chappell, Susan) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig Vanderploeg Defendants Initial Disclosures (Keith, Ann) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laura Aubert re Initial Disclosures (Chappell, Susan) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2018
  • Summons Issued as to Kristen Coultas-Kay, Randall Crandall, Rudy Garcia. (iam) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Aubert. Craig Venderploeg served on 2/22/2018, answer due 3/15/2018. (Chappell, Susan) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Aubert. Katherine Winograd served on 2/20/2018, answer due 3/13/2018. (Chappell, Susan) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Aubert. Central New Mexico Community College served on 2/20/2018, answer due 3/13/2018. (Chappell, Susan) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Summons Issued as to Craig Venderploeg. (ln) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Summons Issued as to Central New Mexico Community College and Katherine Winograd. (ln) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • (#3) Filing fee: received online $ 400, receipt number 1084-5634498 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • (#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh) (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (kdh) (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Violation of Title IX and Section 1983, Assault and Battery, and Prima Facia Tort against Central New Mexico Community College ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Laura Aubert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Chappell, Susan) (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.