This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:54:38 (UTC).

Atterberry v. Glass et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Atterberry filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Glass. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen McMahon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-09067

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen McMahon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald Atterberry

Monticello, NY 12701

Defendants

Sharon L. Janklewicz

Benjamin E. Thomas

John Calvello

Leo Glass

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the relevant fees or submit a completed appropriate IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962).Fees due by 12/3/2018. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 12/3/2018. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on November 2, 2018) (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(jjg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#3

(#3) PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Donald Atterberry.(rdz) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against John Calvello, Leo Glass, Sharon L. Janklewicz, Benjamin E. Thomas. Document filed by Donald Atterberry.(rdz) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#1

(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Donald Atterberry.(rdz) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

4 #1

IFP Application

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Received returned mail re: #4 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application. Mail was addressed to Donald Atterberry 20180886 Sullivan County Jail 4 Bushnell Avenue Monticello, NY 12701 and was returned for the following reason(s): Mail Recipient No Longer At This Address. (vba) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Donald Atterberry 20180886 Sullivan County Jail 4 Bushnell Avenue Monticello, NY 12701. (vba) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the relevant fees or submit a completed appropriate IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962).Fees due by 12/3/2018. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 12/3/2018. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on November 2, 2018) (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(jjg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Donald Atterberry.(rdz) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against John Calvello, Leo Glass, Sharon L. Janklewicz, Benjamin E. Thomas. Document filed by Donald Atterberry.(rdz) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Donald Atterberry.(rdz) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.