This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:19:15 (UTC).

ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER et al v. ALEX M. AZAR, II

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against ALEX M AZAR, II. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudolph Contreras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01993

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rudolph Contreras

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH BALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL

PARKRIDGE WEST HOSPITAL

PROMEDICA TOLEDO HOSPITAL

GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES

SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER

SAINT THOMAS STONES RIVER HOSPITAL

ELKHART GENERAL HOSPITAL

CENTEGRA HOSPITAL WOODSTOCK

GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL

MCLAREN MACOMB

CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER MARSHALL

SAINT CATHERINE HOSPITAL

PROMEDICA FLOWER HOSPITAL

MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL

UPPER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER

PROMEDICA BIXBY HOSPITAL

COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER

Defendant and Not Classified By Court

ALEX M. AZAR, II

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nolan Kent Smith

Attorney at HALL RENDER KILLIAN HEALTH & LYMAN, P.C.

500 North Meridian Street, Suite 400

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1293

N. Kent Smith

Attorney at HALL RENDER KILLIAN HEALTH & LYMAN, P.C.

500 North Meridian Street, Suite 400

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1293

Defendant Attorney

Peter M. Bryce

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 883

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

8 #2

Exhibit USPS Tracking Information

8 #1

Exhibit Certified Card

#8

(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/5/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Card, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking Information)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

7 #2

Exhibit USPS Tracking Information

7 #1

Exhibit Certified Card

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/05/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Card, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking Information)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

6 #2

Exhibit USPS Tracking Information

6 #1

Exhibit Certified Card

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 9/6/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Card, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking Information)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

5 #1

Notice and Consent

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#4

(#4) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER, CENTEGRA HOSPITAL WOODSTOCK, CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER, CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER MARSHALL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, CONWAY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ELKHART GENERAL HOSPITAL, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES, INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH BALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH BLOOMINGTON HOSPITAL, INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH MORGAN HOSPITAL, LA PORTE HOSPITAL, MCLAREN MACOMB, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL - SOUTH BEND, MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL, PARKRIDGE WEST HOSPITAL, PROMEDICA BAY PARK HOSPITAL, PROMEDICA BIXBY HOSPITAL, PROMEDICA FLOWER HOSPITAL, PROMEDICA TOLEDO HOSPITAL, SAINT CATHERINE HOSPITAL, SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL, SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT THOMAS STONES RIVER HOSPITAL, UPPER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, WAKEMED CARY HOSPITAL, WAKEMED RALEIGH CAMPUS (Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 16-0150. (Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nolan Kent Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion to Stay: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is stayed pending the outcome of Azar v. Allina Health Services, No. 17-1484 (S. Ct.). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the November 4, 2018 deadline for Defendant to file his answer to the complaint is vacated and that the parties shall file a joint status report within thirty days after the Supreme Court renders a decision in Azar v. Allina Health Services, No. 17-1484 (S.Ct.). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/22/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/5/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Card, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking Information)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/05/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Card, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking Information)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 9/6/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Card, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking Information)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER, CENTEGRA HOSPITAL WOODSTOCK, CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER, CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER MARSHALL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, CONWAY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ELKHART GENERAL HOSPITAL, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES, INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH BALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH BLOOMINGTON HOSPITAL, INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH MORGAN HOSPITAL, LA PORTE HOSPITAL, MCLAREN MACOMB, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL - SOUTH BEND, MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL, PARKRIDGE WEST HOSPITAL, PROMEDICA BAY PARK HOSPITAL, PROMEDICA BIXBY HOSPITAL, PROMEDICA FLOWER HOSPITAL, PROMEDICA TOLEDO HOSPITAL, SAINT CATHERINE HOSPITAL, SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL, SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT THOMAS STONES RIVER HOSPITAL, UPPER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, WAKEMED CARY HOSPITAL, WAKEMED RALEIGH CAMPUS (Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 16-0150. (Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nolan Kent Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsth) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT UNDER THE MEDICARE ACT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5657247) filed by INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH BLOOMINGTON HOSPITAL, PROMEDICA TOLEDO HOSPITAL, ELKHART GENERAL HOSPITAL, UPPER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, PARKRIDGE WEST HOSPITAL, CENTEGRA HOSPITAL WOODSTOCK, SAINT CATHERINE HOSPITAL, ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER, PROMEDICA BAY PARK HOSPITAL, SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL, MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL, LA PORTE HOSPITAL, WAKEMED CARY HOSPITAL, SAINT THOMAS STONES RIVER HOSPITAL, CONWAY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, WAKEMED RALEIGH CAMPUS, CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH MORGAN HOSPITAL, PROMEDICA FLOWER HOSPITAL, MCLAREN MACOMB, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL - SOUTH BEND, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES, CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER MARSHALL, SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER, PROMEDICA BIXBY HOSPITAL, INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH BALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Alex M. Azar, II, #3 Summons Jeff Sessions, #4 Summons Jessie Liu)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.