This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2018 at 07:55:50 (UTC).

Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 0.16 Acre, more or less, in Pocahontas County, West Virginia, located on parcel identification No. 03-32-0034-0000-0000, and being more particularly described as Lot 18 in Parcel 2 in a deed in book 2 et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2018 Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against 0 16 Acre, more or less, in Pocahontas County, West Virginia, located on parcel identification No 03-32-0034-0000-0000, and being more particularly described as Lot 18 in Parcel 2 in a deed in book 2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Preston Bailey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00093

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Preston Bailey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC

Defendants

Lindsay Jaman South

Lindsay McVay Roberson

Erin Nichole Hankins Gentry

Melissa McVay Mateo

Kathy Conde

0.16 Acre, more or less, in Pocahontas County, West Virginia, located on parcel identification No. 0000-0000, and being more particularly described as Lot 18 in Parcel 2 in a deed in book 2

Jennifer Ford

0.16 Acre, more or less, in Pocahontas County, West Virginia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lauren Kimberly Turner

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC - Bridgeport

400 White Oaks Blvd

Bridgeport, WV 26330

William J O'Brien

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC - Bridgeport

400 White Oaks Blvd

Bridgeport, WV 26330

Brooks Spears

Attorney at McGuire Woods, LLP - McLean

1750 Tysons Blvd., Suite 1800

Mclean, VA 22102

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC of Voluntary Dismissal As To Defendants Jennifer Ford, Jennifer Ford as Trustee of the James W Hankins' Testamentary Children's Trust, and Lindsay McVay Roberson (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lindsay Jaman South served on 9/26/2018. (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lindsay McVay Roberson served on 9/20/2018. (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jennifer Ford(as Trustee of the James W. Hankins' Testamentary Children's Trust). (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jennifer Ford served on 9/19/2018. (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Erin Nichole Hankins Gentry served on 9/19/2018. (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Kathy Conde served on 9/17/2018. (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Melissa McVay Mateo served on 9/16/2018. (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Energy, Inc., Corporate Parent Duke Energy Corp., Corporate Parent Southern Company for Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC.. (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC.(O'Brien, William) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4-plat

1 #3

Exhibit 3-Project Overview Map

1 #2

Exhibit 2-Order Issuing Certificates

1 #1

Exhibit 1-photo of land

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 0.16 Acre, more or less, in Pocahontas County, West Virginia, located on parcel identification No. 03-32-0034-0000-0000, and being more particularly described as Lot 18 in Parcel 2 in a deed in book 2, Kathy Conde, Jennifer Ford(as Trustee of the James W. Hankins' Testamentary Children's Trust), Jennifer Ford, Erin Nichole Hankins Gentry, Melissa McVay Mateo, Lindsay McVay Roberson filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-photo of land, #2 Exhibit 2-Order Issuing Certificates, #3 Exhibit 3-Project Overview Map, #4 Exhibit 4-plat, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing Fee Paid on 08/31/2018 - Receipt #0424-2658452(njz) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC of Voluntary Dismissal As To Defendants Jennifer Ford, Jennifer Ford as Trustee of the James W Hankins' Testamentary Children's Trust, and Lindsay McVay Roberson (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lindsay Jaman South served on 9/26/2018. (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lindsay McVay Roberson served on 9/20/2018. (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jennifer Ford(as Trustee of the James W. Hankins' Testamentary Children's Trust). (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jennifer Ford served on 9/19/2018. (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Erin Nichole Hankins Gentry served on 9/19/2018. (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Kathy Conde served on 9/17/2018. (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Melissa McVay Mateo served on 9/16/2018. (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • (#4) PAPERLESS NOTICE: Case filing began in CM/ECF shell case, with filing fee being paid through pay.gov on (8/31/2018). However, filer failed to complete filing process, following receipt of payment. Clerk's office notified filer of the incomplete document filing and complaint was received on (09/04/2018). (njz) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Energy, Inc., Corporate Parent Duke Energy Corp., Corporate Parent Southern Company for Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC.. (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC.(O'Brien, William) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against 0.16 Acre, more or less, in Pocahontas County, West Virginia, located on parcel identification No. 03-32-0034-0000-0000, and being more particularly described as Lot 18 in Parcel 2 in a deed in book 2, Kathy Conde, Jennifer Ford(as Trustee of the James W. Hankins' Testamentary Children's Trust), Jennifer Ford, Erin Nichole Hankins Gentry, Melissa McVay Mateo, Lindsay McVay Roberson filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-photo of land, #2 Exhibit 2-Order Issuing Certificates, #3 Exhibit 3-Project Overview Map, #4 Exhibit 4-plat, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing Fee Paid on 08/31/2018 - Receipt #0424-2658452(njz) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less