This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2020 at 20:57:31 (UTC).

Atanasio v. Tenaris S.A. et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 Atanasio filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Tenaris S A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Raymond J. Dearie and Sanket J. Bulsara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-07059

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raymond J. Dearie

Referral Judge

Sanket J. Bulsara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles M. Atanasio

Petitioners

City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System

Jeffrey Lynn Sanders

Starr Sanders

The Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W.

Defendants

Edgardo Carlos

Paolo Rocca

Tenaris S.A.

Techint Holdings S. r.l.

San Faustin S.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phillip Kim

Attorney at The Rosen Law Firm

275 Madison Avenue, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Petitioner Attorneys

David Avi Rosenfeld

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP

58 South Service Road, Suite 200

Melville, NY 11747

Melissa Wright

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Lesley Frank Portnoy

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

230 Park Avenue, Suite 530

New York, NY 10169

Kara Wolke

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jason Krajcer

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jeremy Alan Lieberman

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

600 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Defendant Attorneys

Brendan Peter Cullen

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

1870 Embarcadero Road

Palo Alto, CA 94303

Eric Ryan Merron

Attorney at Sulilvan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Sverker K. Hogberg

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

1870 Embarcadero Road

Palo Alto, CA 94303

Robert J. Giuffra, JR.

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Sandra M. Lipsman

Attorney at Joseph Hage Aaronson LLC

485 Lexington Ave., 30Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Douglas James Pepe

Attorney at Gregory P. Joseph Law Offices

485 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Courtney Alyssa Solomon

Attorney at Joseph Hage Aaronson LLC

485 Lexington Avenue, Ste 30Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Gregory P. Joseph

Attorney at Gregory P. Joseph Law Offices LLC.

485 Lexington Avenue, 30Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

#63

#62

#61

60 #6

Exhibit 6 - Perfil Article

60 #5

Exhibit 5 - Rocca Speech Transcription

60 #2

Exhibit 2 - Tender Offer

60 #1

Exhibit 1 - Form 20-F

#60

#56

2 #2

Carlos summons

2 #1

Rocca summons

#2

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

PSLRA Certification

#1

135 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) REPLY in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Edgardo Carlos, Paolo Rocca, Tenaris S.A.. (Cullen, Brendan) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Corporate Disclosure Statement by San Faustin S.A., Techint Holdings S. r.l. identifying Corporate Parent San Faustin S.A. for Techint Holdings S. r.l.. (Joseph, Gregory) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) REPLY in Support re #56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by San Faustin S.A., Techint Holdings S. r.l.. (Joseph, Gregory) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) DECLARATION re #59 Memorandum in Opposition, by Jeffrey Lynn Sanders, Starr Sanders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Form 20-F, #2 Exhibit 2 - Tender Offer, #3 Exhibit 3 - Press Release, #4 Exhibit 4 - Form 6-K, #5 Exhibit 5 - Rocca Speech Transcription, #6 Exhibit 6 - Perfil Article, #7 Exhibit 7 - La Politica Article, #8 Exhibit 8 - Forbes Article, #9 Exhibit 9 - Form 6-K, #10 Exhibit 10 - Reuters Article, #11 Exhibit 11 - Form 6-K, #12 Exhibit 12 - Forms 20-F, #13 Exhibit 13 - Schedule 13D) (Wright, Melissa) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jeffrey Lynn Sanders, Starr Sanders. (Wright, Melissa) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by San Faustin S.A., Techint Holdings S. r.l.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6) (Joseph, Gregory) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) MEMORANDUM in Support re #56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by San Faustin S.A., Techint Holdings S. r.l.. (Joseph, Gregory) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by San Faustin S.A., Techint Holdings S. r.l.. (Joseph, Gregory) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Edgardo Carlos, Paolo Rocca, Tenaris S.A.. (Cullen, Brendan) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Edgardo Carlos, Paolo Rocca, Tenaris S.A.. (Cullen, Brendan) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Jeffrey Lynn Sanders, Starr Sanders. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Jeffrey Lynn Sanders, Starr Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Charles M. Atanasio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PSLRA Early Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - PSLRA Certification, #3 Exhibit 3 - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit 4 - Firm Resume) (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Charles M. Atanasio. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Related Case indicated on the civil cover sheet in case number 19cv174. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Rocca summons, #2 Carlos summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Edgardo Carlos, Paolo Rocca, Tenaris S.A. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11016685 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Charles M. Atanasio. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons) (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason L Krajcer PHV

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Avi Rosenfeld

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kara M. Wolke