This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:01:54 (UTC).

Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Carolina Professional Builders LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Atain Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Carolina Professional Builders LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Bruce Howe Hendricks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02352

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bruce Howe Hendricks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Atain Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

Carolina Professional Builders LLC

John E McGrath

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Margarete Linsay Allio

Attorney at LW Cooper Jr Law Offices

36 Broad Street

Charleston, SC 29401

Lindsey W Cooper, Jr

Attorney at LW Cooper Jr Law Offices

36 Broad Street

Charleston, SC 29401

Defendant Attorney

Ivon Keith McCarty

Attorney at McCarty Law Firm

1212 Wappoo Road

Charleston, SC 29407

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Carolina Professional Builders LLC.(McCarty, Ivon) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to John E McGrath. (vdru, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

10 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service (John E. McGrath)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Carolina Professional Builders LLC, John E McGrath ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7961823.), filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Service due by 11/21/2018.(vdru, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Atain Specialty Insurance Company.(vdru, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

9 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service (Carolina Professional Builders LLC)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Ivon Keith McCarty on behalf of Carolina Professional Builders LLC (McCarty, Ivon) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. John E McGrath served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service (John E. McGrath))(Allio, Margarete) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#11

(#11) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Carolina Professional Builders LLC.(McCarty, Ivon) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Carolina Professional Builders LLC served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service (Carolina Professional Builders LLC))(Allio, Margarete) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Carolina Professional Builders LLC. (vdru, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Carolina Professional Builders LLC.(McCarty, Ivon) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. John E McGrath served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service (John E. McGrath))(Allio, Margarete) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Carolina Professional Builders LLC served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service (Carolina Professional Builders LLC))(Allio, Margarete) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Carolina Professional Builders LLC.(McCarty, Ivon) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Ivon Keith McCarty on behalf of Carolina Professional Builders LLC (McCarty, Ivon) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to John E McGrath. (vdru, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Carolina Professional Builders LLC. (vdru, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Atain Specialty Insurance Company.(vdru, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Carolina Professional Builders LLC, John E McGrath ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7961823.), filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Service due by 11/21/2018.(vdru, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.