This case was last updated from PACER on 12/11/2018 at 08:18:14 (UTC).

AstraZeneca AB et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2018 AstraZeneca AB filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Irene M. Keeley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00193

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Irene M. Keeley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

AstraZeneca AB

Defendants

Mylan Inc.

Mylan N.V.

Mylan Laboratories Limited

Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary M. Rubman

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

One Citycenter, 850 Tenth St. Nw

Washington, DC 20001

James F. Companion

Attorney at Schrader Companion Duff & Law, PLLC

401 Main Street

Wheeling, WV 26003

Anna Q. Han

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

One Citycenter, 850 Tenth St. Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Christopher N. Sipes

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

1201 Pennsylvania Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20044-7566

Matthew Kudzin

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

One Citycenter, 850 Tenth St. Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher N. Sipes. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/23/2018. (Copy counsel of record)(jmm) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gary M. Rubman. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/23/2018. (copy counsel of record)(jmm) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Kudzin. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/23/2018. (copy counsel of record)(jmm) Modified on 10/24/2018 corrected signature date in docket text. (jmm). (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anna Q. Han Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/23/2018. (copy counsel of record)(jmm) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#12

RESTRICTED

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#11

(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Christopher N. Sipes by AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Gary M. Rubman by AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Matthew Kudzin by AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Anna Q. Han by AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#7

(#7) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorneys Han, Sipes, Rubman and Kudzin. (mh) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca AB. (mh) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (mh) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher N. Sipes. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/23/2018. (Copy counsel of record)(jmm) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gary M. Rubman. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/23/2018. (copy counsel of record)(jmm) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Kudzin. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/23/2018. (copy counsel of record)(jmm) Modified on 10/24/2018 corrected signature date in docket text. (jmm). (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anna Q. Han Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/23/2018. (copy counsel of record)(jmm) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee: $ 800.00, receipt number WVNC002386. For Attorneys A. Han, M. Kedzin, G. Rubman and C. Sipes. (jmm) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Christopher N. Sipes by AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Gary M. Rubman by AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Matthew Kudzin by AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Anna Q. Han by AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorneys Han, Sipes, Rubman and Kudzin. (mh) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002000. (mh) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca AB. (mh) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (mh) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint,. (mh) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Supplemental Information for Patent Cases Involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) re #1 Complaint, filed by AstraZeneca AB and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Modified on 10/12/2018 to correct filer. NEF regen (mh). (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan N.V. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and AstraZeneca AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patent Information, #2 Exhibit B - Patent Information, #3 Exhibit C - Patent Information, #4 Exhibit D - Patent Information, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.