This case was last updated from PACER on 09/16/2018 at 07:04:05 (UTC).

Astar v. The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/18/2018 Astar filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Manish S. Shah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-04895

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manish S. Shah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald Astar

Defendants

Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, The

The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles Jeffrey Thut

Attorney at Noonan Perillo and Thut

25 N. County Street

Waukegan, IL 60085

Defendant Attorneys

Brian C Spahn

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn, S.c.

833 East Michigan Street, Suite 1800

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Scott Andrew Nehls

Attorney at Fuchs & Roselli, Ltd

440 West Randolph Street, Suite 500

Chicago, IL 60606

Paul F. Heaton

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn, S.C.

833 East Michigan Street, Suite 1800

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) RESPONSE by Donald Astarin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company #9 (Thut, Charles) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#19

(#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time #16 is granted. Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss #9 is now due 9/14/18. Defendant's reply is due 9/28/18. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Status hearing on 11/6/18 is stricken and reset to 11/29/18 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#18

(#18) RESPONSE by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company to MOTION by Plaintiff Donald Astar for extension of time #16 (Heaton, Paul) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Motion by Charles Jeffrey Thut for presentment of extension of time #16 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 9/4/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Thut, Charles) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#16

(#16) MOTION by Plaintiff Donald Astar for extension of time (Thut, Charles) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Spahn, Brian) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Motion hearing held. The briefing schedule on defendant's motion to dismiss #9 is as follows: plaintiff's response is due 8/28/18; defendant's reply 9/11/18. Discovery under the MIDP shall be exchanged by 8/24/18. All other discovery is stayed. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #13 is granted. Continued status hearing is set for 11/6/18 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14751528. (Heaton, Paul) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

#9

(#11) NOTICE of Motion by Brian C Spahn for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #9 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 7/31/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Spahn, Brian) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

#6

(#6) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (mc, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, The by Scott Andrew Nehls (Nehls, Scott) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, The (Spahn, Brian) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

3 #1

Certificate of Service

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, The by Brian C Spahn (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Spahn, Brian) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

2 #1

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Spahn, Brian) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Summons & Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Lake County Circuit Court, case number (18L453) filed by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, The Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14711868. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons & Complaint)(Spahn, Brian) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) RESPONSE by Donald Astarin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company #9 (Thut, Charles) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time #16 is granted. Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss #9 is now due 9/14/18. Defendant's reply is due 9/28/18. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Status hearing on 11/6/18 is stricken and reset to 11/29/18 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) RESPONSE by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company to MOTION by Plaintiff Donald Astar for extension of time #16 (Heaton, Paul) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Motion by Charles Jeffrey Thut for presentment of extension of time #16 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 9/4/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Thut, Charles) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION by Plaintiff Donald Astar for extension of time (Thut, Charles) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Spahn, Brian) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Motion hearing held. The briefing schedule on defendant's motion to dismiss #9 is as follows: plaintiff's response is due 8/28/18; defendant's reply 9/11/18. Discovery under the MIDP shall be exchanged by 8/24/18. All other discovery is stayed. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #13 is granted. Continued status hearing is set for 11/6/18 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14751528. (Heaton, Paul) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to Complaint by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company(Spahn, Brian) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Motion by Brian C Spahn for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #9 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 7/31/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Spahn, Brian) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company (Spahn, Brian) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Donald Astar by Charles Jeffrey Thut (Thut, Charles) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mc, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (mc, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, The by Scott Andrew Nehls (Nehls, Scott) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, The (Spahn, Brian) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (acm) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, The by Brian C Spahn (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Spahn, Brian) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Spahn, Brian) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Lake County Circuit Court, case number (18L453) filed by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, The Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14711868. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons & Complaint)(Spahn, Brian) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTHWESTERN MUTUAL LIFE INSURANCE COMP- is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer C. Jeffrey Thut