This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/11/2018 at 07:01:20 (UTC).

ASML Netherlands B.V. et al v. Nikon Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2018 ASML Netherlands B filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is James Donato. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-05592

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ASML Netherlands B.V.

ASML US, LLC

ASML US, L.P.

Defendants

Nikon Precision Inc.

Nikon Corporation

Nikon Research Corporation of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Richard Headley

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

500 Arguello St., Ste. 500

Redwood City, CA 94063

Andrew R. Kopsidas

Attorney at Fish and Richardson P.C.

1000 Maine Avenue, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20024

Kenton William Freeman, Jr.

Attorney at Fish and Richardson P.C.

One Marina Park Drive

Boston, MA 02210

Kurt L. Glitzenstein

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

One Marina Park Drive

Boston, MA 02210-1878

Ryan Patrick O'Connor

Attorney at Fish and Richardson P.C.

12390 El Camino Real

San Diego, CA 92130

Defendant Attorney

Jack Williford Londen

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market St.

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

 

Court Documents

22 #2

Proposed Order

22 #1

Declaration of Jack W. Londen

#22

#21

#20

#19

17 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

13 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#13

1 #56

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #55

Exhibit 21-36

1 #54

Exhibit 21-35

1 #53

Exhibit 21-34

1 #40

Exhibit 21-21

1 #22

Exhibit 21-3

1 #21

Exhibit 21-2

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER. The Court grants the Nikon defendants' #22 unopposed motion, and stays this civil action, Case No. 18-cv-05592-JD, pending final resolution of ITC Investigation No. 337-TA-1137, including any appeals. The Court orders the case administratively closed during the stay, and directs the parties to promptly notify the Court of any developments in the ITC proceedings. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/1/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Stay Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay Pending Completion of Internal Trade Commission Investigation filed by Nikon Corporation, Nikon Precision Inc., Nikon Research Corporation of America. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 11/6/2018. Replies due by 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jack W. Londen, #2 Proposed Order)(Londen, Jack) (Filed on 10/23/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION to Waive Service and Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Nikon Corporation, Nikon Precision Inc., Nikon Research Corporation of America. (Londen, Jack) (Filed on 10/11/2018) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ryan O'Connor. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kenton William Freeman, Jr. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2018.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/1/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12722217.) filed by ASML Netherlands B.V., ASML US, L.P., ASML US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Freeman, Kenton) (Filed on 9/28/2018) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on September 28, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Docket(#15) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ASML Netherlands B.V., ASML US, L.P., ASML US, LLC.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #9 Kurt Glitzenstein's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12684240.) filed by ASML Netherlands B.V., ASML US, L.P., ASML US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing)(Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Filed on 9/17/2018) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORRECTED EXHIBIT 2 re #1 Complaint, filed byASML Netherlands B.V., ASML US, L.P., ASML US, LLC. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2018) Modified on 9/14/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Nikon Corporation, Nikon Precision Inc., Nikon Research Corporation of America. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by ASML Netherlands B.V., ASML US, L.P., ASML US, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ASML US, L.P. for ASML US, LLC; Corporate Parent ASML Holding N.V., Corporate Parent ASML Netherlands B.V. for ASML US, L.P.; Corporate Parent ASML Holding N.V. for ASML Netherlands B.V.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Nikon Corporation, Nikon Precision Inc., Nikon Research Corporation of America ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12673458.). Filed byASML US, LLC, ASML Netherlands B.V., ASML US, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 **PDF Error, See docket no. #8 ** Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 18 (17 was deliberately omitted), #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21-1, #21 Exhibit 21-2, #22 Exhibit 21-3, #23 Exhibit 21-4, #24 Exhibit 21-5, #25 Exhibit 21-6, #26 Exhibit 21-7, #27 Exhibit 21-8, #28 Exhibit 21-9, #29 Exhibit 21-10, #30 Exhibit 21-11, #31 Exhibit 21-12, #32 Exhibit 21-13, #33 Exhibit 21-14, #34 Exhibit 21-15, #35 Exhibit 21-16, #36 Exhibit 21-17, #37 Exhibit 21-18, #38 Exhibit 21-19, #39 Exhibit 21-20, #40 Exhibit 21-21, #41 Exhibit 21-22, #42 Exhibit 21-23, #43 Exhibit 21-24, #44 Exhibit 21-25, #45 Exhibit 21-26, #46 Exhibit 21-27, #47 Exhibit 21-28, #48 Exhibit 21-29, #49 Exhibit 21-30, #50 Exhibit 21-31, #51 Exhibit 21-32, #52 Exhibit 21-33, #53 Exhibit 21-34, #54 Exhibit 21-35, #55 Exhibit 21-36, #56 Civil Cover Sheet)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/12/2018) Modified on 9/14/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NIKON PRECISION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ASML US, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nikon Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew R. Kopsidas