This case was last updated from PACER on 12/30/2018 at 07:36:06 (UTC).

ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd. et al v. Stentech, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2018 ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Stentech, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul J. Barbadoro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01002

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul J. Barbadoro

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd.

ASM Assembly Systems LLC

Defendants

Stentech, Inc.

Blue Ring Stencils, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter Anthony Nieves

Attorney at Sheehan Phinney Bass & Green

1000 Elm St, 17Th Flr, Po Box 3701

Manchester, NH 03105-3701

Kyle B. Fleming

Attorney at Renner Otto

1621 Euclid Ave, Fl 19

Cleveland, OH 4415

Robert R. Lucic

Attorney at Sheehan Phinney Bass & Green PA

1000 Elm St, Po Box 3701

Manchester, NH 03105-3701

Mark C. Johnson

Attorney at Renner Otto

1621 Euclid Ave, Fl 19

Cleveland, OH 4415

Defendant Attorneys

John F. Bennett

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne LLP

600 Vine St, Ste 2800

Cincinnati, OH 45202-2409

Gary Ervery Lambert

Attorney at Lambert Shortell and Connaughton

92 State St, Ste 200

Boston, MA 02109

Pierre A. Chabot

Attorney at Wadleigh Starr & Peters PLLC

95 Market St

Manchester, NH 03101

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Pierre A. Chabot on behalf of Blue Ring Stencils, LLC, Stentech, Inc.(Chabot, Pierre) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Ervery Lambert on behalf of Blue Ring Stencils, LLC, Stentech, Inc. Attorney Gary Ervery Lambert added to party Blue Ring Stencils, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Gary Ervery Lambert added to party Stentech, Inc.(pty:dft).(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

21 #1

Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of John F. Bennett, Esquire

#21

(#21) Assented to MOTION for John F. Bennett, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1743691.) filed by Blue Ring Stencils, LLC, Stentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of John F. Bennett, Esquire)(Chabot, Pierre) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#20

(#20) RESCHEDULING NOTICE OF PATENT CASE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The attached notice contains important information regarding special patent case related events that must be used when filing documents in a patent case. Counsel should print or otherwise save this notice and follow the instructions closely when filing documents in this case. Patent Case Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Follow up on Discovery Plan 1/8/2019. (js) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ASM Assembly Systems LLC, ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd. re: #18 Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment, (CORRECTED) (Nieves, Peter) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#18

(#18) NO CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Because not all parties to the case consent to the assignment of a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, 28 U.S.C. sec. 636(c), and Local Rule 73.1(b)(2), the case will be assigned to a United States District Judge. Clerk Daniel J. Lynch. (Nieves, Peter) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#17

(#17) Disclosure Statement by Stentech, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Chabot, Pierre) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#16

(#16) Disclosure Statement by Blue Ring Stencils, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Chabot, Pierre) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by ASM Assembly Systems LLC, ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd..(Nieves, Peter) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

1 #7

Summons - Waiver to Blue Ring Stencils, LLC

1 #6

Summons - Waiver to Stentech, Inc.

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by ASM Assembly Systems LLC, ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd. and ASM Assembly Systems LLC shall file a disclosure statement by November 13, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 11/13/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (mc) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Pierre A. Chabot on behalf of Blue Ring Stencils, LLC, Stentech, Inc.(Chabot, Pierre) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Ervery Lambert on behalf of Blue Ring Stencils, LLC, Stentech, Inc. Attorney Gary Ervery Lambert added to party Blue Ring Stencils, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Gary Ervery Lambert added to party Stentech, Inc.(pty:dft).(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Assented to Motion for John F. Bennett, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that John F. Bennett, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 12/24/2018.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Assented to MOTION for John F. Bennett, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1743691.) filed by Blue Ring Stencils, LLC, Stentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of John F. Bennett, Esquire)(Chabot, Pierre) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) RESCHEDULING NOTICE OF PATENT CASE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The attached notice contains important information regarding special patent case related events that must be used when filing documents in a patent case. Counsel should print or otherwise save this notice and follow the instructions closely when filing documents in this case. Patent Case Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Follow up on Discovery Plan 1/8/2019. (js) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Case reassigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Reason for Reassignment: Not all parties consent to the assignment of this case to the magistrate judge. The new case designation is: 18-cv-1002-PB. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(kad) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ASM Assembly Systems LLC, ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd. re: #18 Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment, (CORRECTED) (Nieves, Peter) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NO CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Because not all parties to the case consent to the assignment of a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, 28 U.S.C. sec. 636(c), and Local Rule 73.1(b)(2), the case will be assigned to a United States District Judge. Clerk Daniel J. Lynch. (Nieves, Peter) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Disclosure Statement by Stentech, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Chabot, Pierre) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Disclosure Statement by Blue Ring Stencils, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Chabot, Pierre) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summonses issued electronically as to Blue Ring Stencils, LLC, Stentech, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(mc) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert R. Lucic on behalf of ASM Assembly Systems LLC, ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd. Attorney Robert R. Lucic added to party ASM Assembly Systems LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Robert R. Lucic added to party ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd.(pty:pla).(Lucic, Robert) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by ASM Assembly Systems LLC, ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd. and ASM Assembly Systems LLC shall file a disclosure statement by November 13, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 11/13/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (mc) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiffs for service on all parties.(mc) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1002-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Kyle B. Fleming to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1727742.) filed by ASM Assembly Systems LLC, ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd.. Follow up on Objection on 11/14/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Nieves, Peter) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Mark C. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1727733.) filed by ASM Assembly Systems LLC, ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd.. Follow up on Objection on 11/14/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Nieves, Peter) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by ASM Assembly Systems LLC, ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd..(Nieves, Peter) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1727674 filed by ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd., ASM Assembly Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons - Waiver to Stentech, Inc., #7 Summons - Waiver to Blue Ring Stencils, LLC)(Nieves, Peter) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.