This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 07:40:55 (UTC).

Arter et al v. Thomas et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2018 Arter filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Thomas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald A. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00322

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Savannah Arter

Defendants

William Bernard Thomas

Jane Doe

John Doe

Andrea Thomas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Paul Truskett

Attorney at Truskett Law Firm, PLLC

2202 E 49Th St, Ste 400

Tulsa, OK 74105

Defendant Attorney

Stephen M. Coates

Attorney at Wilson Cain & Acquaviva (Tulsa)

1717 S Boulder, Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74119

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Andrea Thomas, William Bernard Thomas (Coates, Stephen) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Wagoner County District Court, case number CJ-2018-297 by Andrea Thomas, William Bernard Thomas (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing parties to file their Disclosures and Joint Status Report no later than 10/22/2018 (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stephen M. Coates on behalf of Andrea Thomas, William Bernard Thomas (Coates, Stephen) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Andrea Thomas, William Bernard Thomas (Coates, Stephen) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summons

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Andrea Thomas, William Bernard Thomas (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Savannah Arter(Individually), Savannah Arter(as Parent, Guardian and Next Friend of M.A., a minor) (Truskett, John) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White setting scheduling order dates: Exhibit List due by 1/2/2019; Witness List due by 1/2/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2019; Discovery due by 2/8/2019; Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 3/14/2019; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/14/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 1:30 PM in Chambers, Room 227, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White; Jury Trial set for 4/2/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Room 224, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White.(tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Andrea Thomas, William Bernard Thomas (Coates, Stephen) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#11

(#11) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: Settlement Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. (Settlement Conference Statements are due 2/28/2019)(sjr, Chambers) Modified on 10/29/2018 to edit time and regenerate NEF (dma, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 10/24/2018)

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Petition

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: Settlement Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. (Settlement Conference Statements are due 2/28/2019)(sjr, Chambers) Modified on 10/29/2018 to edit time and regenerate NEF (dma, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White setting scheduling order dates: Exhibit List due by 1/2/2019; Witness List due by 1/2/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2019; Discovery due by 2/8/2019; Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 3/14/2019; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/14/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 1:30 PM in Chambers, Room 227, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White; Jury Trial set for 4/2/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Room 224, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White.(tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Andrea Thomas, William Bernard Thomas (Coates, Stephen) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Savannah Arter(Individually), Savannah Arter(as Parent, Guardian and Next Friend of M.A., a minor) (Truskett, John) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Andrea Thomas, William Bernard Thomas (Coates, Stephen) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Andrea Thomas, William Bernard Thomas (Coates, Stephen) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing parties to file their Disclosures and Joint Status Report no later than 10/22/2018 (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stephen M. Coates on behalf of Andrea Thomas, William Bernard Thomas (Coates, Stephen) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/20/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1208523 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by William Bernard Thomas (Coates, Stephen) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 9/27/2018)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from Wagoner County District Court, case number CJ-2018-297 by Andrea Thomas, William Bernard Thomas (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Andrea Thomas, William Bernard Thomas (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Jane Doe, John Doe, Andrea Thomas, William Bernard Thomas by Savannah Arter (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.