This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:57:03 (UTC).

Armstead v. Osceola County, Florida et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Armstead filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Osceola County, Florida. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J. Kelly and Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-01643

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brenda C. Armstead

Orlando, FL 32803

Defendants

Osceola County, Florida

California Head Offices

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against California Head Offices, Osceola County, Florida filed by Brenda C. Armstead. (Filing fee not paid; IFP motion not submitted)(ALL) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#2

(#2) ORDER: On or before Monday, October 29, 2018, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to either pay the filing fee in full or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/11/2018. (JLC) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Mail returned as Undeliverable re: #2 Order pdf. Mail NOT resent to Brenda C. Armstead. (LMM) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Set deadlines: Filing Fee payment or Motion to proceed in forma pauperis due by 10/29/2018 (BIA) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER: On or before Monday, October 29, 2018, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to either pay the filing fee in full or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/11/2018. (JLC) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against California Head Offices, Osceola County, Florida filed by Brenda C. Armstead. (Filing fee not paid; IFP motion not submitted)(ALL) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.