This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:53:02 (UTC).

ARMENTA v. BAYER CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 ARMENTA filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against BAYER CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN R. PADOVA and PETRESE B. TUCKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-04249

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN R. PADOVA

PETRESE B. TUCKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KARLA ARMENTA

Defendants

BAYER S.A.

BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC

BAYER U.S. LLC

CONCEPTUS SAS

BAYER AG

BAYER PHARMA AG

BAYER ESSURE INC.

BAYER CORPORATION

BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TERENCE MATTHEW LECKMAN

Attorney at LECKMAN LAW LLC

527 Bethan Road

Elkins Park, PA 19027

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOPHER BOISVERT

Attorney at COPO STRATEGIES

30 South 15Th Street, 15Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service by M. Jane Nunn re: served Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice to Defend, Complaint and Verification upon Bayer Healthcare LLC by personal service on November 7, 2018 (LECKMAN, TERENCE) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Daniel Newcomb re: served Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice to Defend, Complaint and Verification upon Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by personal service on November 5, 2018 (LECKMAN, TERENCE) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#2

(#2) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA TO HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/9/2018. 10/11/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#4

(#4) Praecipe to Issue Alias Summonses by KARLA ARMENTA. (LECKMAN, TERENCE) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER IS CONSOLIDATED WITH OTHER BAYER ESSURE CASES (DOC. LEAVE CASE CIVIL ACTION NO.: 14-7315) BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA FOR DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL MOTIONS ONLY. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/10/2018. 10/11/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UREPS AND E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Daniel Newcomb re: served Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice to Defend, Complaint and Verification upon Bayer Essure, Inc. by personal service on November 5, 2018 (LECKMAN, TERENCE) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER U.S. LLC.(BOISVERT, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., BAYER U.S. LLC from Court of Common Pleas Philadelphia County, Case ID: October Term, 2018-181000028, together with Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 185722) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheets)(ti, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/4/2018) (ti, ). (Entered: 10/04/2018)

1 #1

Cover Sheets

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service by M. Jane Nunn re: served Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice to Defend, Complaint and Verification upon Bayer Healthcare LLC by personal service on November 7, 2018 (LECKMAN, TERENCE) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Daniel Newcomb re: served Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice to Defend, Complaint and Verification upon Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by personal service on November 5, 2018 (LECKMAN, TERENCE) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Daniel Newcomb re: served Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice to Defend, Complaint and Verification upon Bayer Essure, Inc. by personal service on November 5, 2018 (LECKMAN, TERENCE) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • (#6) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (sg, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER U.S. LLC.(BOISVERT, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • 9 Summons Issued as to BAYER AG, BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., BAYER PHARMA AG, BAYER S.A., BAYER U.S. LLC, CONCEPTUS SAS. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 10/26/2018. (sg, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Praecipe to Issue Alias Summonses by KARLA ARMENTA. (LECKMAN, TERENCE) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER IS CONSOLIDATED WITH OTHER BAYER ESSURE CASES (DOC. LEAVE CASE CIVIL ACTION NO.: 14-7315) BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA FOR DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL MOTIONS ONLY. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/10/2018. 10/11/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UREPS AND E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA TO HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/9/2018. 10/11/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., BAYER U.S. LLC from Court of Common Pleas Philadelphia County, Case ID: October Term, 2018-181000028, together with Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 185722) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheets)(ti, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/4/2018) (ti, ). (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.