This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:00:37 (UTC).

Arliss et al v. Groupon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Arliss filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Groupon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dana M. Sabraw and Jan M. Adler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01977

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana M. Sabraw

Referral Judge

Jan M. Adler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Barrie Arliss

Jeff Lawrie

Defendants

Spa Blix, Inc.

Groupon, Inc.

does 1 through 100, inclusive

Full Circle Farms, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jay S Carlson

Attorney at CARNEY GILLESPIE ISITT PLLP

100 W Harrison St Ste N440

Seattle, WA 98119

Sean P Gillespie

Attorney at CARNEY GILLESPIE ISITT PLLP

100 W Harrison St Ste N440

Seattle, WA 98119

Shaun Van Eyk

Attorney at Van Eyk & Moore PLLC

100 W Harrison Street, Suite N-440

Seattle, WA 98119

Kenan Lee Isitt

Attorney at CARNEY GILLESPIE ISITT PLLP

100 W Harrison St Ste N440

Seattle, WA 98119

Jason Moore

Attorney at VAN EYK & MOORE

100 W Harrison Street, Suite N-440

Seattle, WA 98119

Christopher Robert Carney

Attorney at Carney Gillespie Isitt PLLP

100 West Harrison Street, Suite N440

Seattle, WA 98119

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley T. Meissner

Attorney at Fenwick & West, LLP

1191 Second Avenue, 10Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101

Stellman Keehnel

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP US

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 7000

Seattle, WA 98104-7044

David C Lundsgaard

Attorney at GRAHAM & DUNN

2801 Alaskan Way, Ste 300 Pier 70

Seattle, WA 98121-1128

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) DECLARATION of Joseph Del Preto in Support of Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Groupon, Inc.. (Keehnel, Stellman) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 05/27/2011)

#13

(#13) Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:11-cv-00896. Original file received electronically (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stellman Keehnel on behalf of Defendants Full Circle Farms, Inc., Groupon, Inc.. (Keehnel, Stellman) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/01/2011)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER CONCERNING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by parties. (Meissner, Bradley) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/03/2011)

#5

(#5) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by United States District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/01/2011)

13 #1

*Restricted*

#9

(#9) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER CONCERNING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by parties. (Meissner, Bradley) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/10/2011)

#12

(#12) MDL 2238 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 1); in re Groupon; Southern District of CA; assigned to Judge Dana M Sabraw. (RS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/20/2011)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER by John C. Coughenour, United States District Judge. The Court GRANTS the parties' joint stipulated motion to continue a deadline to respond to the amended complaint, docket no. #9 . (CL) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/13/2011)

1 #1

Exhibit A (pp 9-53) - State Court Record

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MKB) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 05/31/2011)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David C Lundsgaard on behalf of Defendant Full Circle Farms, Inc.. (Lundsgaard, David) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/01/2011)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 11-2-15609-5-SEA; (Receipt # 0981-2444130), filed by Groupon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (pp 9-53) - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keehnel, Stellman) Modified Exhibit A page count per filer on 5/27/2011 (RE). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 05/27/2011)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • (#14) Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler assigned to transfer case from Western District of Washington. (no document attached) (jpp) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:11-cv-00896. Original file received electronically (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MDL 2238 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 1); in re Groupon; Southern District of CA; assigned to Judge Dana M Sabraw. (RS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/20/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • (#11) NOTICE of STRIKING the STATUS CONFERENCE set on TUESDAY, JULY 26, 2011 @ 9:00 a.m. in light of the Order transferring this matter to the MDL in the Southern District of California. No appearances by the parties is required. (PP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/16/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Notice of Electronic Filing The following transaction was entered on 6/14/2011 at 8:44 AM EDT and filed on 6/14/2011 Case Name: IN RE: Groupon, Inc., Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation Case Number:MDL No. 2238 Filer:Document Number:No document attached Docket Text: ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) Finalized on 06/14/2011. Please see pleading ( 4 in ALM/2:11-cv-00342, 11 in CAN/3:11-cv-01893, 4 in ILN/1:11-cv-02557, 16 in MA/1:11-cv-10556, 59 in MDL No. 2238, #3 in WAW/2:11-cv-00896).As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the S.D. California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 6/14/2011.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2238, ALM/2:11-cv-00342, CAN/3:11-cv-01893, ILN/1:11-cv-02557, MA/1:11-cv-10556, WAW/2:11-cv-00896 (dn) (RS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/15/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER by John C. Coughenour, United States District Judge. The Court GRANTS the parties' joint stipulated motion to continue a deadline to respond to the amended complaint, docket no. #9 . (CL) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/13/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER CONCERNING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by parties. (Meissner, Bradley) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/10/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER CONCERNING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by parties. (Meissner, Bradley) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/03/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stellman Keehnel on behalf of Defendants Full Circle Farms, Inc., Groupon, Inc.. (Keehnel, Stellman) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/01/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David C Lundsgaard on behalf of Defendant Full Circle Farms, Inc.. (Lundsgaard, David) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/01/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by United States District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/01/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • (#4) MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case; 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion; 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule; 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury; 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 8. Settlement probabilities; and 9. Whether the parties consent to proceed to trial before an assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, arrangements may be made to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at (206) 370-8805 no less than ONE WEEK prior to the proceeding. COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF (DEFENDANT IF THE CASE IS A REMOVAL) IS DIRECTED TO NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. The Status Conference is hereby ordered set on TUESDAY, JULY 26, 2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before United States District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/01/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2011
  • Defendant Groupon Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/7/2011 pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. (MKB) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 05/31/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MKB) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 05/31/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2011
  • Judge John C Coughenour added. (MKB) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 05/31/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DECLARATION of Joseph Del Preto in Support of Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Groupon, Inc.. (Keehnel, Stellman) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 05/27/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 11-2-15609-5-SEA; (Receipt # 0981-2444130), filed by Groupon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (pp 9-53) - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keehnel, Stellman) Modified Exhibit A page count per filer on 5/27/2011 (RE). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 05/27/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.