Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/26/2021 at 06:54:27 (UTC).

Arland Kelley v. HCR ManorCare, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/28/2017 Arland Kelley filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against HCR ManorCare, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jack Zouhary and Jeffrey J. Helmick. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-02493

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jack Zouhary

Jeffrey J. Helmick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arland Kelley

Defendants

HCP, Inc.

Christine Garvey

Peter Rhein

Joseph Sullivan

Michael McKee

James Hoffmann

David Henry

Lauralee Martin

Timothy Schoen

HCR ManorCare, Inc.

Brian Cartwright

Thomas Herzog

Lauralee E. Martin

Thomas M. Herzog

Scott A. Anderson

Timothy M. Schoen

James P. Hoffman

Christine N. Garvey

Michael D. Mckee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Robert Noblin

Attorney at Green & Noblin

4Th Floor, 4500 East Pacific Coast Highway

Long Beach, CA 90804

Robert S Green

Attorney at Green and Noblin PC

2200 Larkspur Landing Circle Suite 101

Larkspur, CA 94939

William B. Federman

Attorney at Federman & Sherwood

10205 North Pennsylvania Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73120

Marc E. Dann

Attorney at DannLaw

P.O. Box 6031040

Cleveland, OH 44103

Robert S. Green

Attorney at Green & Noblin

2200 Larkspur Landing Circle

Larkspur, CA 94939

Michael A. Smith, Jr.

Attorney at DannLaw

P.O. Box 6031040

Cleveland, OH 44103

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah A. Istel

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison - New York

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Audra J. Soloway

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison - New York

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Daniel J. Kramer

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison - New York

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Brian Neach

Attorney at Ste. 900

17011 Beach Blvd.

Huntington Beach, CA 92647

Kirsten R. Fraser

Attorney at Porter, Wright, Morris & Arthur - Columbus

29Th Floor, 41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

James A. King

Attorney at Porter, Wright, Morris & Arthur - Columbus

29Th Floor, 41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Jessie Morgan Gabriel

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10111

Jessie M. Gabriel

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - New York

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Thomas D. Warren

Attorney at Warren Terzian

30799 Pinetree Road

Pepper Pike, OH 44124

 

Court Documents

#78

(#78) Order of Case Dismissal with prejudice. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 1/5/2021. (S,AL) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#77

(#77) Proposed Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal filed by Scott A. Anderson, Brian G. Cartwright, Christine N. Garvey, HCP, Inc., David B. Henry, Thomas M. Herzog, Lauralee E. Martin, Michael D. Mckee, Peter L. Rhein, Timothy M. Schoen, Joseph P. Sullivan. (King, James) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#76

(#76) Order: I order Kelley to show cause, within 30 days of the date of this Order, why the First Amended Complaint should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim. If Kelley files a show-cause brief, Defendants shall file their brief in response within 45 days of the date of this Order. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 11/30/2020. (S,AL) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#75

(#75) Notice of Withdrawal of Sarah A. Istel as Counsel for HCP Defendants filed by Brian G. Cartwright, Christine N. Garvey, HCP, Inc., David B. Henry, Thomas M. Herzog, James P. Hoffman, Lauralee E. Martin, Michael D. Mckee, Peter L. Rhein, Timothy M. Schoen, Joseph P. Sullivan. (King, James) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#74

(#74) Marginal Entry Order granting attorney Jessie M. Gabriel's motion to withdraw as attorney for defendant HCR ManoCare, Inc. (Related Doc #73 ) Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 1/22/2019.(S,AL) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#73

(#73) Motion by Jessie M. Gabriel to withdraw as attorney filed by Defendant HCR ManorCare, Inc.. (Gabriel, Jessie) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#72

(#72) Attorney Appearance by Thomas D. Warren filed by on behalf of HCR ManorCare, Inc.. (Warren, Thomas) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#71

(#71) Response to this Court's Order dated May 29, 2018 filed by Arland Kelley. Related document(s) #70 . (Federman, William) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

#70

(#71) Response to this Court's Order dated May 29, 2018 filed by Arland Kelley. Related document(s) #70 . (Federman, William) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant HCP, Inc.. (jp) [Transferred from cacd on 11/28/2017.] (Entered: 07/21/2017)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendants Brian Cartwright, Christine Garvey, HCR ManorCare, Inc., David Henry, Thomas Herzog, James Hoffmann, Lauralee Martin, Michael McKee, Peter Rhein, Timothy Schoen, Joseph Sullivan. (jp) [Transferred from cacd on 11/28/2017.] (Entered: 07/21/2017)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) [Transferred from cacd on 11/28/2017.] (Entered: 07/21/2017)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (jp) [Transferred from cacd on 11/28/2017.] (Entered: 07/21/2017)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Arland Kelley, (Green, Robert) [Transferred from cacd on 11/28/2017.] (Entered: 07/21/2017)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Arland Kelley. (Green, Robert) [Transferred from cacd on 11/28/2017.] (Entered: 07/21/2017)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Arland Kelley. (Green, Robert) [Transferred from cacd on 11/28/2017.] (Entered: 07/21/2017)

#2

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Arland Kelley. (Green, Robert) [Transferred from cacd on 11/28/2017.] (Entered: 07/21/2017)

#1

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant HCP, Inc.. (jp) [Transferred from cacd on 11/28/2017.] (Entered: 07/21/2017)

101 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) Order of Case Dismissal with prejudice. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 1/5/2021. (S,AL) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) Proposed Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal filed by Scott A. Anderson, Brian G. Cartwright, Christine N. Garvey, HCP, Inc., David B. Henry, Thomas M. Herzog, Lauralee E. Martin, Michael D. Mckee, Peter L. Rhein, Timothy M. Schoen, Joseph P. Sullivan. (King, James) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) Order: I order Kelley to show cause, within 30 days of the date of this Order, why the First Amended Complaint should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim. If Kelley files a show-cause brief, Defendants shall file their brief in response within 45 days of the date of this Order. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 11/30/2020. (S,AL) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketLAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) Notice of Withdrawal of Sarah A. Istel as Counsel for HCP Defendants filed by Brian G. Cartwright, Christine N. Garvey, HCP, Inc., David B. Henry, Thomas M. Herzog, James P. Hoffman, Lauralee E. Martin, Michael D. Mckee, Peter L. Rhein, Timothy M. Schoen, Joseph P. Sullivan. (King, James) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) Marginal Entry Order granting attorney Jessie M. Gabriel's motion to withdraw as attorney for defendant HCR ManoCare, Inc. (Related Doc #73 ) Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 1/22/2019.(S,AL) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) Motion by Jessie M. Gabriel to withdraw as attorney filed by Defendant HCR ManorCare, Inc.. (Gabriel, Jessie) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) Attorney Appearance by Thomas D. Warren filed by on behalf of HCR ManorCare, Inc.. (Warren, Thomas) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) Response to this Court's Order dated May 29, 2018 filed by Arland Kelley. Related document(s) #70 . (Federman, William) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen) [Transferred from cacd on 11/28/2017.] (Entered: 08/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant HCP, Inc.. (jp) [Transferred from cacd on 11/28/2017.] (Entered: 07/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendants Brian Cartwright, Christine Garvey, HCR ManorCare, Inc., David Henry, Thomas Herzog, James Hoffmann, Lauralee Martin, Michael McKee, Peter Rhein, Timothy Schoen, Joseph Sullivan. (jp) [Transferred from cacd on 11/28/2017.] (Entered: 07/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) [Transferred from cacd on 11/28/2017.] (Entered: 07/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (jp) [Transferred from cacd on 11/28/2017.] (Entered: 07/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Arland Kelley, (Green, Robert) [Transferred from cacd on 11/28/2017.] (Entered: 07/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Arland Kelley. (Green, Robert) [Transferred from cacd on 11/28/2017.] (Entered: 07/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Arland Kelley. (Green, Robert) [Transferred from cacd on 11/28/2017.] (Entered: 07/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Arland Kelley. (Green, Robert) [Transferred from cacd on 11/28/2017.] (Entered: 07/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20220063 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Arland Kelley. (Attorney Robert S Green added to party Arland Kelley(pty:pla))(Green, Robert) [Transferred from cacd on 11/28/2017.] (Entered: 07/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HCP INC FORMERLY KNOWN AS HEALTH CARE PROPERTY INVESTORS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where HCR MANORCARE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Neach