This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2019 at 07:30:32 (UTC).

Arkansas Times LP v. Waldrip et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 Arkansas Times LP filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Waldrip. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian S. Miller. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00914

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arkansas Times LP

Defendants

C C Gibson

Kelly Eichler

Steve Cox

John Goodson

David Pryor

Morril Harriman

Sheffield Nelson

Tommy Boyer

Stephen Broughton

Mark Waldrip

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vera Eidelman

Attorney at ACLU Foundation

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Brian Hauss

Attorney at ACLU Foundation

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Bettina E. Brownstein

Attorney at Betinna E. Brownstein Law Firm

904 West Second Street, Suite 2

Little Rock, AR 72201

John L. Burnett

Attorney at Lavey & Burnett

904 West 2Nd Street

Little Rock, AR 72201

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Cantrell

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building, 323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-2610

Dylan L. Jacobs

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building, 323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-2610

Ka Tina Rena Guest

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building, 323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-2610

Nicholas Jacob Bronni

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building, 323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-2610

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Arkansas Times LP. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT069988. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#2

(#19) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller:Motion Hearing held on 1/4/2019 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Arguments heard including boycott issue, the issue of standing, and irreparable harm. Plaintiff's exhibit 1 admitted. Defendants' exhibits 1-5 admitted. Matter taken under advisement. Bettina Brownstein, John Burnett, and Brian Hauss present for the plaintiff. Nicholas Bronni, Dylan Jacobs, and Ka Tina Guest present for the defendants. (Court Reporter Margie Kruse.) (lp) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#3

(#3) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arkansas Times LP. (kdr) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#4

(#6) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/13/18. (lp) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

4 #1

Affidavit

#5

(#6) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/13/18. (lp) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

5 #1

Affidavit

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Cantrell on behalf of All Defendants (Cantrell, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#23

(#23) ORDER denying #2 Arkansas Times's motion for a preliminary injunction; granting #15 defendants' motion to dismiss; denying as moot #22 Defendants' motion for leave to file a reply brief; and dismissing with prejudice this case. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/23/2019. (cmn) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#24

(#24) JUDGMENT: Consistent with #23 order, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/23/2019. (cmn) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

22 #1

Document Proposed Reply Brief

#15

(#15) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants (Jacobs, Dylan) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#22

(#22) MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Document Proposed Reply Brief)(Jacobs, Dylan) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#21

RESTRICTED

#20

(#20) RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and REPLY in Support re #2 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Arkansas Times LP. (Eidelman, Vera) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Ka Tina Rena Guest on behalf of Tommy Boyer, Stephen Broughton, Steve Cox, Kelly Eichler, C C Gibson, John Goodson, Morril Harriman, Sheffield Nelson, David Pryor, Mark Waldrip (Guest, Ka Tina) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER authorizing Bettina Brownstein, John Burnettt, Vera Eidelman, Brian Hauss, Nicholas Jacob Bronni, Michael Cantrell, and Dylan Jacobs, along with their assistants to bring electronic devices into the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse in Little Rock beginning Friday, 1/4/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/4/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) JUDGMENT: Consistent with #23 order, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/23/2019. (cmn) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER denying #2 Arkansas Times's motion for a preliminary injunction; granting #15 defendants' motion to dismiss; denying as moot #22 Defendants' motion for leave to file a reply brief; and dismissing with prejudice this case. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/23/2019. (cmn) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Document Proposed Reply Brief)(Jacobs, Dylan) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 1/4/2019, before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Court Reporter Margaret M. Kruse. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 1/23/2019. Redaction Request due 2/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2019. (fcd) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and REPLY in Support re #2 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Arkansas Times LP. (Eidelman, Vera) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller:Motion Hearing held on 1/4/2019 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Arguments heard including boycott issue, the issue of standing, and irreparable harm. Plaintiff's exhibit 1 admitted. Defendants' exhibits 1-5 admitted. Matter taken under advisement. Bettina Brownstein, John Burnett, and Brian Hauss present for the plaintiff. Nicholas Bronni, Dylan Jacobs, and Ka Tina Guest present for the defendants. (Court Reporter Margie Kruse.) (lp) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Ka Tina Rena Guest on behalf of Tommy Boyer, Stephen Broughton, Steve Cox, Kelly Eichler, C C Gibson, John Goodson, Morril Harriman, Sheffield Nelson, David Pryor, Mark Waldrip (Guest, Ka Tina) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER authorizing Bettina Brownstein, John Burnettt, Vera Eidelman, Brian Hauss, Nicholas Jacob Bronni, Michael Cantrell, and Dylan Jacobs, along with their assistants to bring electronic devices into the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse in Little Rock beginning Friday, 1/4/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/4/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Jacobs, Dylan) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants (Jacobs, Dylan) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan L. Jacobs on behalf of All Defendants (Jacobs, Dylan) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Cantrell on behalf of All Defendants (Cantrell, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 7 Notice of Hearing on Motion. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the docket entry is a text entry only pursuant to instruction from Chambers. (jak) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2019 at 11:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. (lp) (Docket text modified on 12/14/2018 to indicate the docket entry is a text entry only pursuant to instruction from Chambers) (jak) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/13/18. (lp) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Vera Eidelman. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3366883. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Burnett, John) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Brian Hauss. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3366870. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Burnett, John) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arkansas Times LP. (kdr) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief by Arkansas Times LP. (kdr) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Arkansas Times LP. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT069988. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.