This case was last updated from PACER on 02/16/2019 at 08:02:48 (UTC).

Arion, L.L.C. v. LMLC Holdings, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2018 Arion, L L C filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against LMLC Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01053

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arion, L.L.C.

Defendants

Todd Barnhardt

LMLC Holdings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David C. Hurst

Attorney at Bruggeman, Hurst & Associates, PC

20012 Wolf Road, Suite 200

Mokena, IL 60448

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas David Strom

Attorney at Krieg DeVault LLP

30 North Lasalle, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60602

Peter M. Reinhardt

Attorney at Bakke Norman, S.C.

2919 Schneider Ave., P.O. Box 280

Menomonie, WI 54751

Timothy J. O'Brien

Attorney at Bakke Norman, S.C.

1200 Heritage Drive, P. O. Box 308

New Richmond, WI 54017

 

Court Documents

#28

No Description Available

#34

(#34) Disregard. Modified on 1/9/2019. (lak) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#33

(#33) ANSWER by Defendants Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. (Reinhardt, Peter) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

31 #1

Exhibit 1 - Notification of Party Contact Information

26 #1

Exhibit A

#23

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

No Description Available

#8

(#9) NOTICE by Arion, L.L.C. re attorney appearance #8 (Hurst, David) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#3

(#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by LMLC Holdings, Inc. (Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The motion to withdraw by defendants' attorneys (dkt. #38 ) is GRANTED. Defendants have until February 25, 2019 for new counsel to file an appearance on their behalf. The telephonic preliminary pretrial conference is moved to March 8, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/23/2019. (jls) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. (O'Brien, Timothy) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy J. O'Brien for Defendants Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. (O'Brien, Timothy) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Disregard. Modified on 1/9/2019. (lak) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy J. O'Brien for Defendants Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. (lak) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Disregard. Modified on 1/9/2019. (lak) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Set Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2019 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ANSWER by Defendants Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. (Reinhardt, Peter) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicholas David Strom withdrawn from the case. Defendants are to retain replacement counsel forthwith so that this case may proceed toward just, speedy and inexpensive resolution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/21/2018. (jls) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. Response due 12/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notification of Party Contact Information) (Strom, Nicholas) Modified on 12/21/2018. (lak) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by Arion, L.L.C. re attorney appearance #8 (Hurst, David) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Arion, L.L.C. by David C. Hurst (Hurst, David) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (jk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (daj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. by Nicholas David Strom (Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by LMLC Holdings, Inc. (Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. re notice of removal, #1 (Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County Illinois Law Division, case number (18 L 7197) filed by Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14883137. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.