This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2019 at 07:27:14 (UTC).

ARCHEY v. COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 ARCHEY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David S. Cercone and Peter J. Phipps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01521

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

David S. Cercone

Peter J. Phipps

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARY FRANCES ARCHEY

Pittsburgh, PA 15236

Defendants

JAY COSTA, JR.

MONA N. GENERETT

CHARLES M. POWELL

COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY

WILLIAM T. CAGNEY

COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF TRUSTEES

JIM FLYNN

AMY M. KUNTZ

ELAYNE ARRINGTON

JOHN PALMIERE

GREG PEASLEE

QUINTIN BULLOCK

FREDERICK W. THIEMAN

KEVIN KINROSS

MARY ANN EISENREICH

AYANNA M. LEE-DAVIS

CHARLENE NEWKIRK

JULIE DERENCE

FRANK SARGENT

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Julie A. Aquino

Attorney at Campbell Durrant Beatty Palombo & Miller

535 Smithfield Street, Suite 700

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Brian P. Gabriel

Attorney at Campbell Durrant Beatty Palombo & Miller, P.C.

535 Smithfield Street, Suite 700

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Julie A. Aquino on behalf of ELAYNE ARRINGTON, QUINTIN BULLOCK, WILLIAM T. CAGNEY, COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY, COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF TRUSTEES, JAY COSTA, JR, JULIE DERENCE, MARY ANN EISENREICH, JIM FLYNN, MONA N. GENERETT, MARTHA WOODWARD ISLER, KEVIN KINROSS, AMY M. KUNTZ, AYANNA M. LEE-DAVIS, KIMBERLY MANIGAULT, CHARLENE NEWKIRK, JOHN PALMIERE, GREG PEASLEE, CHARLENE G. PETRELLI, CHARLES M. POWELL, BONITA RICHARDSON, JAMES SACCO, FRANK SARGENT, FREDERICK W. THIEMAN. (Aquino, Julie) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Gabriel on behalf of ELAYNE ARRINGTON, QUINTIN BULLOCK, WILLIAM T. CAGNEY, COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY, COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF TRUSTEES, JAY COSTA, JR, JULIE DERENCE, MARY ANN EISENREICH, JIM FLYNN, MONA N. GENERETT, MARTHA WOODWARD ISLER, KEVIN KINROSS, AMY M. KUNTZ, AYANNA M. LEE-DAVIS, KIMBERLY MANIGAULT, CHARLENE NEWKIRK, JOHN PALMIERE, GREG PEASLEE, CHARLENE G. PETRELLI, CHARLES M. POWELL, BONITA RICHARDSON, JAMES SACCO, FRANK SARGENT, FREDERICK W. THIEMAN. (Gabriel, Brian) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#2

(#2) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk shall reassign this action to another member of the Court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 11/20/18. (njt) (Entered: 11/23/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Receipt

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 24668053004), filed by MARY FRANCES ARCHEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Receipt, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Julie A. Aquino on behalf of ELAYNE ARRINGTON, QUINTIN BULLOCK, WILLIAM T. CAGNEY, COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY, COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF TRUSTEES, JAY COSTA, JR, JULIE DERENCE, MARY ANN EISENREICH, JIM FLYNN, MONA N. GENERETT, MARTHA WOODWARD ISLER, KEVIN KINROSS, AMY M. KUNTZ, AYANNA M. LEE-DAVIS, KIMBERLY MANIGAULT, CHARLENE NEWKIRK, JOHN PALMIERE, GREG PEASLEE, CHARLENE G. PETRELLI, CHARLES M. POWELL, BONITA RICHARDSON, JAMES SACCO, FRANK SARGENT, FREDERICK W. THIEMAN. (Aquino, Julie) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Gabriel on behalf of ELAYNE ARRINGTON, QUINTIN BULLOCK, WILLIAM T. CAGNEY, COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY, COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF TRUSTEES, JAY COSTA, JR, JULIE DERENCE, MARY ANN EISENREICH, JIM FLYNN, MONA N. GENERETT, MARTHA WOODWARD ISLER, KEVIN KINROSS, AMY M. KUNTZ, AYANNA M. LEE-DAVIS, KIMBERLY MANIGAULT, CHARLENE NEWKIRK, JOHN PALMIERE, GREG PEASLEE, CHARLENE G. PETRELLI, CHARLES M. POWELL, BONITA RICHARDSON, JAMES SACCO, FRANK SARGENT, FREDERICK W. THIEMAN. (Gabriel, Brian) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Judge Peter J. Phipps presiding. (nll) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk shall reassign this action to another member of the Court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 11/20/18. (njt) (Entered: 11/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 24668053004), filed by MARY FRANCES ARCHEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Receipt, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less