This case was last updated from PACER on 12/11/2018 at 08:07:02 (UTC).

Arbogast v. Minnix et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2018 Arbogast filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Minnix. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Trumble and Gina M. Groh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00168

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert W. Trumble

Presiding Judge

Gina M. Groh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Franklin Arbogast

Belington, WV 26250

Defendants

Rex Skidmore

Debra Minnix

Tygart Valley Regional Jail

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/5/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

9 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#9

(#9) AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/31/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff; copy of order and consent to financial deputy and trustee clerk.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#8

(#8) RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#7

(#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/18/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

6 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#6

(#6) ORDER GRANTING #2 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/19/2018. Copy of Order and #3 Consent to Trustee Officer and copy of order to pro se pls by cm,rrr. (cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd). (Entered: 10/19/2018)

5 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 10/12/2018)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Debra Minnix, Rex Skidmore, Tygart Valley Regional Jail, filed by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/5/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/31/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff; copy of order and consent to financial deputy and trustee clerk.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/18/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER GRANTING #2 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/19/2018. Copy of Order and #3 Consent to Trustee Officer and copy of order to pro se pls by cm,rrr. (cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd). (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 ledger sheet, #2 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Debra Minnix, Rex Skidmore, Tygart Valley Regional Jail, filed by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.