This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:59:23 (UTC).

Arbogast v. Minnix et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Arbogast filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Minnix. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Trumble and Gina M. Groh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00135

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert W. Trumble

Presiding Judge

Gina M. Groh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Franklin Arbogast

Belington, WV 26250

Defendants

Cpl. Womsley

Jeff Sandy

Robert Petrice

Kathy Weekly

Elkins State Police

Debra Minnix

Cpt. Arnold

Brent Waybright

Davis Health Systems

Jim Justice

David Farmer

Cpl. Wimer

Betsy C. Jividen

 

Court Documents

22 #1

Envelope

#22

(#22) RECOMMENDATION filed by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#21

(#21) RETURN RECEIPT as to #19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/24/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

20 #1

Envelope

#20

(#20) OBJECTION to #19 Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

19 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#19

(#19) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9/19/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 09/19/2018)

18 #2

Acess to the Judicial Process

#18

(#18) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cpt. Arnold, Davis Health Systems, Elkins State Police, David Farmer, Betsy C. Jividen, Jim Justice, Debra Minnix, Robert Petrice, Jeff Sandy, Brent Waybright, Kathy Weekly, Cpl. Wimer, Cpl. Womsley, filed by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 Grievances, #2 Acess to the Judicial Process, #3 Grievances, #4 Statement, #5 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

cover letter

1 #1

letter from warden

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cpt. Arnold, Davis Health Systems, Elkins State Police, Debra Minnix, Robert Petrice, Jeff Sandy, Brent Waybright, Kathy Weekly, Cpl. Womsley, filed by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 letter from warden, #2 cover letter, #3 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) RECOMMENDATION filed by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) RETURN RECEIPT as to #19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/24/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) OBJECTION to #19 Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9/19/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cpt. Arnold, Davis Health Systems, Elkins State Police, David Farmer, Betsy C. Jividen, Jim Justice, Debra Minnix, Robert Petrice, Jeff Sandy, Brent Waybright, Kathy Weekly, Cpl. Wimer, Cpl. Womsley, filed by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 Grievances, #2 Acess to the Judicial Process, #3 Grievances, #4 Statement, #5 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RETURN RECEIPT as to #14 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, #15 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #16 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/10/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER TERMINATING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9/5/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff; copy of order and consent sent to financial deputy and trustee clerk.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9/5/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff; copy of order and consent to collect to financial deputy Howell and trustee clerk. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTED COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9/5/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cpt. Arnold, Davis Health Systems, Elkins State Police, David Farmer, Betsy C. Jividen, Jim Justice, Debra Minnix, Robert Petrice, Jeff Sandy, Brent Waybright, Kathy Weekly, Cpl. Wimer, filed by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Change of Address by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/27/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Change of Address by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 balance statement, #2 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Cpt. Arnold, Davis Health Systems, Elkins State Police, Debra Minnix, Robert Petrice, Jeff Sandy, Brent Waybright, Kathy Weekly, Cpl. Womsley, filed by John Franklin Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 letter from warden, #2 cover letter, #3 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less