This case was last updated from PACER on 12/02/2018 at 07:34:29 (UTC).

A.R. v. Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System et al

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 A R filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William C Griesbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01554

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Griesbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A.R.

Defendants

Michael Beitz

Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mary E Kennelly

Attorney at Fox & Fox SC

124 W Broadway

Monona, WI 53716-3999

Defendant Attorneys

Shannon A Conlin

Attorney at Wisconsin Department of Justice

17 W Main St, Po Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

Anne M Bensky

Attorney at Wisconsin Department of Justice

17 W Main St, Po Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs regarding Civil L.R. 10(c ) Motion to Continue to Proceed Using a Pseudonym, Michael Beitz (Kennelly, Mary)

#13

(#13) BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #12 MOTION Civil L.R. 10(c ) motion to continue to proceed in this matter using a pseudonym . (Kennelly, Mary)

#12

(#12) MOTION Civil L.R. 10(c ) motion to continue to proceed in this matter using a pseudonym by All Plaintiffs. (Kennelly, Mary)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System - Waiver sent on 10/8/2018. (Kennelly, Mary)

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) STIPULATION to Extend Answer Deadline by Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System. (Bensky, Anne)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon A Conlin on behalf of Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System. Attorney(s) appearing: Shannon A. Conlin and Anne M. Bensky (Conlin, Shannon)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Anne M Bensky on behalf of Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System. Attorney(s) appearing: Anne M. Benksy and Shannon A. Conlin (Bensky, Anne)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.R.. Michael Beitz served on 10/10/2018. (Kennelly, Mary)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by A.R.. (Kennelly, Mary)

1 #3

Summons UW Board of Regents

1 #2

Summons Michael Beitz

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by A.R.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2935598) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Michael Beitz, #3 Summons UW Board of Regents)(Kennelly, Mary)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs regarding Civil L.R. 10(c ) Motion to Continue to Proceed Using a Pseudonym, Michael Beitz (Kennelly, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #12 MOTION Civil L.R. 10(c ) motion to continue to proceed in this matter using a pseudonym . (Kennelly, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION Civil L.R. 10(c ) motion to continue to proceed in this matter using a pseudonym by All Plaintiffs. (Kennelly, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) TEXT ONLY ORDER approving #7 Stipulation to Extend Answer Deadline signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 11/1/2018. The answer deadline for all defendants in this case is 12/7/2018. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System - Waiver sent on 10/8/2018. (Kennelly, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Conlin, Shannon)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Kennelly, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION to Extend Answer Deadline by Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System. (Bensky, Anne)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon A Conlin on behalf of Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System. Attorney(s) appearing: Shannon A. Conlin and Anne M. Bensky (Conlin, Shannon)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Anne M Bensky on behalf of Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System. Attorney(s) appearing: Anne M. Benksy and Shannon A. Conlin (Bensky, Anne)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.R.. Michael Beitz served on 10/10/2018. (Kennelly, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE Statement by A.R.. This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Kennelly, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by A.R.. (Kennelly, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by A.R.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2935598) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Michael Beitz, #3 Summons UW Board of Regents)(Kennelly, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less