This case was last updated from PACER on 06/03/2018 at 07:01:36 (UTC).

Anuwave LLC v. Sophos, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Anuwave LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sophos, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jennifer C. Boal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-10655

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer C. Boal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anuwave LLC

Defendant

Sophos, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gustavo A. Chico-Barris

Attorney at Ferraiuoli LLC

221 Ponce De Leon Ave., 5Th Floor

San Juan, PR 00917

Jean G Vidal-Font

Attorney at Ferraiuoli LLC

221 Plaza Building, 5Th Floor

San Juan, PR 00917

Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola

Attorney at Ferraiuoli LLC

221 Ponce De Leon Avenue, 5Th Floor

San Juan, PR 00917

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to June 13, 2018 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Defendant Sophos, Inc. by Anuwave LLC.(Chico-Barris, Gustavo) (Entered: 05/07/2018)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Sophos, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING/TERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Chico-Barris, Gustavo) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

4 #2

Affidavit of Jean G. Vidal Font in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss

4 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Jean G. Vidal-Font

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jean G. Vidal-Font Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7081626 by Anuwave LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Jean G. Vidal-Font, #2 Affidavit of Jean G. Vidal Font in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss its Complaint with Prejudice)(Chico-Barris, Gustavo) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

3 #2

Affidavit of Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola

3 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7081612 by Anuwave LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola, #2 Affidavit of Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola)(Chico-Barris, Gustavo) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

#2

(#2) EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, Summons as to Sophos, Inc. by Anuwave LLC. (Chico-Barris, Gustavo) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Patent No. US 8,295,862

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Sophos, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7080555 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Anuwave LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patent No. US 8,295,862, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chico-Barris, Gustavo) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/5/2018) (McDonagh, Christina). (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/5/2018) (McDonagh, Christina). (Entered: 04/04/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to June 13, 2018 to File Answer re 1 Complaint. Sophos, Inc. answer due 6/13/2018. (York, Steve) (Entered: 05/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to June 13, 2018 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Defendant Sophos, Inc. by Anuwave LLC.(Chico-Barris, Gustavo) (Entered: 05/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jean G. Vidal-Font. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (York, Steve) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (York, Steve) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Sophos, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • (#6) NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING/TERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Chico-Barris, Gustavo) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jean G. Vidal-Font Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7081626 by Anuwave LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Jean G. Vidal-Font, #2 Affidavit of Jean G. Vidal Font in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss its Complaint with Prejudice)(Chico-Barris, Gustavo) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7081612 by Anuwave LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola, #2 Affidavit of Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola)(Chico-Barris, Gustavo) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, Summons as to Sophos, Inc. by Anuwave LLC. (Chico-Barris, Gustavo) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Sophos, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7080555 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Anuwave LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patent No. US 8,295,862, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chico-Barris, Gustavo) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/5/2018) (McDonagh, Christina). (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/5/2018) (McDonagh, Christina). (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.