This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:55 (UTC).

Animal Welfare Institute et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Animal Welfare Institute filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against United States Department of Agriculture. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael A. Telesca. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-06626

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Telesca

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Animal Welfare Institute

Farm Sanctuary

Defendants

United States Department of Agriculture

Food Safety and Inspection Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William N. Lawton

Attorney at Meyer Glitzenstein & Eubanks, LLP

4115 Wisconsin Ave. Nw, Suite 210

Washington, DC 20016

Defendant Attorney

Michael S. Cerrone

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

138 Delaware Avenue

Buffalo, NY 14202

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 11/16/2018. Replies due by 12/31/2018.. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 10/4/18. (JMC) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Food Safety and Inspection Service, United States Department of Agriculture. (Cerrone, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Food Safety and Inspection Service, United States Department of Agriculture.(Cerrone, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Cerrone on behalf of Food Safety and Inspection Service, United States Department of Agriculture (Cerrone, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

2 #3

summons issued

2 #2

summons issued

2 #1

summons issued

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Food Safety and Inspection Service, United States Department of Agriculture, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 summons issued, #2 summons issued, #3 summons issued)(SG) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

1 #5

Supplement Summons

1 #4

Supplement Summons

1 #3

Supplement Summons

1 #2

Supplement Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3197613, filed by Animal Welfare Institute, Farm Sanctuary. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons, #3 Supplement Summons, #4 Supplement Summons, #5 Supplement Summons)(Lawton, William) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE: Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 11/16/2018. Replies due by 12/31/2018. Motion will be submitted without oral argument on 1/10/2019 before Hon. Michael A. Telesca. No court appearances are required. (JMC) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 11/16/2018. Replies due by 12/31/2018.. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 10/4/18. (JMC) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Animal Welfare Institute, Farm Sanctuary. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lawton, William) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE: Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/11/2018. Replies due by 10/18/2018. Motion will be submitted without oral argument on 10/25/2018 before Hon. Michael A. Telesca. No court appearances are required. (JMC) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Food Safety and Inspection Service, United States Department of Agriculture. (Cerrone, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Food Safety and Inspection Service, United States Department of Agriculture.(Cerrone, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Cerrone on behalf of Food Safety and Inspection Service, United States Department of Agriculture (Cerrone, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • (#3) TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASEIT HEREBY IS ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to the Rochester Division of the United States District Court for the Western District of New York.SO ORDERED.Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 8/29/2018. (CMD)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Food Safety and Inspection Service, United States Department of Agriculture, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 summons issued, #2 summons issued, #3 summons issued)(SG) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3197613, filed by Animal Welfare Institute, Farm Sanctuary. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons, #3 Supplement Summons, #4 Supplement Summons, #5 Supplement Summons)(Lawton, William) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less