This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2018 at 07:56:26 (UTC).

Angell et al v. CSX Transportation, Inc. et. al. (TV1)

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 Angell filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CSX Transportation, Inc TV1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas A Varlan and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00313

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William Hendricks

Sherry McKee

Suhn Brown

David Delfyette

Samantha Cooper

Sarah Headrick

Amber Hickman

Patricia Evans

Annette Marshall

Rebecca Loveday-Harper

Joshua Banton

Stephanie Gasche

Jon Jeffries

Lora Cooper

Angel Humphrey

Brandon McLaughlin

Brian Myers

Ashley Batts

Darren Nelson

David Bittlers

376 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary A Davis

Attorney at Gary A. Davis & Associates

21 Battery Park Avenue, Suite 206

Asheville, NC 28801

David Karnas

Attorney at Karnas Law Firm, PLLC

565 South 4Th Avenue

Yuma, AZ 85364

H Douglas Nichol

Attorney at Nichol & Associates

6759 Baum Drive

Knoxville, TN 37919

Beecher A Bartlett, Jr

Attorney at Kramer, Rayson LLP (Knox)

Po Box 629, 800 South Gay Street, Suite 2500

Knoxville, TN 37929

Craig L Garrett

Attorney at Craig L Garrett, Attorney at Law PLLC

607 Smithview Drive

Maryville, TN 37803

Todd J Moody

Attorney at Hagood Moody Hodge PLC

2100 Riverview Tower, 900 S. Gay St.

Knoxville, TN 37902

Other Attorneys

M David Karnas

Attorney at Karnas Law Firm, PLLC

4810 E. Broadway Blvd.

Tucson, AZ 85711

Scott L Winkelman

Attorney at Crowell & Moring, LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2595

April N Ross

Attorney at Crowell & Moring, LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2595

John W Baker, Jr

Attorney at Baker, O'Kane, Atkins & Thompson

2607 Kingston Pike, Suite 200, P O Box 1708

Knoxville, TN 37901-1708

Emily L Herman-Thompson

Attorney at Baker, O'Kane, Atkins & Thompson

2607 Kingston Pike, Suite 200, P O Box 1708

Knoxville, TN 37901-1708

Michael J King

Attorney at Paine Bickers LLP

900 S. Gay Street, Suite 2200

Knoxville, TN 37902

Joshua B Fleming

Attorney at Quarles & Brady, LLP (IN)

135 N. Pennsylvania Street, Suite 2400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Jacob V Bradley

Attorney at Quarles & Brady, LLP (IN)

135 N. Pennsylvania Street, Suite 2400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

25 #1

Exhibit Order

#25

(#25) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)(Baker, John) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#23

(#23) SUPPLEMENT to #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joshua Fleming ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3771813.) by Union Tank Car Company. (King, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#22

(#22) SUPPLEMENT to #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacob Bradley ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3771800.) by Union Tank Car Company. (King, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to Joshua Fleming re: #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joshua Fleming. A certificate of good standing from another district court must be submitted. If the required certificates or filing fee are not submitted within 15 days of this Notice, your motion may be summarily denied.(ABF) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

19 #1

Other Certificate of Good Standing

#19

(#19) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joshua Fleming ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3771813.) by Union Tank Car Company. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(King, Michael) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

18 #1

Other Certificate of Good Standing

#18

(#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacob Bradley ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3771800.) by Union Tank Car Company. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(King, Michael) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice April N. Ross ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3743091.) by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Baker, John) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER, the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to Tipton, et al. v. CSX Transportation, Inc., et al., No. 3:15-CV-311. Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Thomas A. Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin, this case will also be assigned to Chief District Judge Thomas A. Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin. However, consolidation is not ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 8/10/18. (ADA) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Baker, John) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Union Tank Car Company.(King, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) regarding Attorneys Scott Winkelman, April Ross and David Karnas. (BJL, ) Modified on 8/2/2018 (BJL,).*Mailed to David Karnas. (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by CSX Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSX Transportation, Inc. for CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Baker, John) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

1 #2

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Blount County Circuit Court, case number L-19942. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3731344), filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Baker, John) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)(Baker, John) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 9/21/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacob Bradley ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3771800.) filed by Union Tank Car Company, #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joshua Fleming ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3771813.) filed by Union Tank Car Company (ABF) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) SUPPLEMENT to #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joshua Fleming ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3771813.) by Union Tank Car Company. (King, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) SUPPLEMENT to #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacob Bradley ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3771800.) by Union Tank Car Company. (King, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to Joshua Fleming re: #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joshua Fleming. A certificate of good standing from another district court must be submitted. If the required certificates or filing fee are not submitted within 15 days of this Notice, your motion may be summarily denied.(ABF) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to Jacob Bradley re: #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacob Bradley. A certificate of good standing from another district court must be submitted. If the required certificates or filing fee are not submitted within 15 days of this Notice, your motion may be summarily denied.(ABF) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joshua Fleming ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3771813.) by Union Tank Car Company. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(King, Michael) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacob Bradley ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3771800.) by Union Tank Car Company. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(King, Michael) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendant may respond to plaintiffs motion to remand on or before October 15, 2018. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/13/18. (ABF) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott L. Winkelman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3743100.) by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Baker, John) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice April N. Ross ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3743091.) by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Baker, John) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER, the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to Tipton, et al. v. CSX Transportation, Inc., et al., No. 3:15-CV-311. Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Thomas A. Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin, this case will also be assigned to Chief District Judge Thomas A. Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin. However, consolidation is not ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 8/10/18. (ADA) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin assigned. (ADA) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Baker, John) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Union Tank Car Company.(King, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) regarding Attorneys Scott Winkelman, April Ross and David Karnas. (BJL, ) Modified on 8/2/2018 (BJL,).*Mailed to David Karnas. (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • [PLEASE DISREGARD] -Docketing Error.(BJL, ). Modified on 8/2/2018 (BJL,). (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by CSX Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSX Transportation, Inc. for CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Baker, John) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Blount County Circuit Court, case number L-19942. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3731344), filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Baker, John) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less