This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2018 at 13:22:08 (UTC).

Angel Lomeli v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2017 Angel Lomeli filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Union Pacific Railroad Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenly Kiya Kato and Fernando M. Olguin. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:17-CV-00146

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angel Lomeli

Defendants

Union Pacific Railroad Company

Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peggy A Farrell

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

Margie Rene Potter

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

Defendant Attorneys

Danielle Hultenius Moore

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips LLP

4747 Executive Drive Suite 1000

San Diego, CA 92121

Megan Emily Walker

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips LLP

4747 Executive Drive Suite 1000

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Case Terminated; Made JS-6) (vdr)

#18

(#18) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS OR DISMISSAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 9/19/2017. (vdr)

#15

(#15) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato re Stipulation for Protective Order 14 The parties are advised that the Court declinesto issue the proposed protective order to which they have stipulated.. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) (dts)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Case Terminated; Made JS-6) (vdr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS OR DISMISSAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 9/19/2017. (vdr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato re Stipulation for Protective Order 14 The parties are advised that the Court declinesto issue the proposed protective order to which they have stipulated.. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) (dts)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Margie Rene Potter