This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:44 (UTC).

ANDREWS v. PRIEBS et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 ANDREWS filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against PRIEBS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Douglas E. Arpert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-13306

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Arpert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMIR ANDREWS

Trenton, NJ 08625-0861

Defendants

SERGEANT GOOD

OFFICER D. PRIEBS

D. HUNTER

SERGEANT TERESA DEJESUS

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Exhibit Summons

1 #5

Exhibit A-F

#1

(#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Letter, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Envelope, #5 Exhibit A-F, #6 Letter from Attorney)(jem) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel by AMIR ANDREWS. (jem) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

1 #2

Letter

1 #6

Letter from Attorney

1 #1

Application IFP

1 #4

Envelope

#3

(#3) ORDER that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; that the Complaint shall be filed but SUMMONS SHALL NOT ISSUE at this time. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/5/2018. (mmh) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT filed. See docket entry #1 for Complaint.(mmh) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; that the Complaint shall be filed but SUMMONS SHALL NOT ISSUE at this time. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/5/2018. (mmh) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono. Motion set for 9/17/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel by AMIR ANDREWS. (jem) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Letter, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Envelope, #5 Exhibit A-F, #6 Letter from Attorney)(jem) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.