This case was last updated from PACER on 12/17/2018 at 07:56:18 (UTC).

Andrews v. FCI Gilmer

Case Summary

On 10/18/2018 Andrews filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against FCI Gilmer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John Preston Bailey and James P. Mazzone. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00107

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Preston Bailey

Referral Judge

James P. Mazzone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jerome Andrews

Glenville, WV 26351-6000

Defendant

FCI Gilmer

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, Order Dismissing Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/10/18. (njz) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

10 #1

Certified Mail Receipt

#10

(#10) ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #9 MOTION FOR EXTENSION AND APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 12/7/18. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2018: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (njz). Modified on 12/10/2018-corrected description of attachment (njz). (Entered: 12/07/2018)

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) (Styled as Notice of 30 Days) Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time to File, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jerome Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(njz) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

8 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#8

(#8) ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOLLOWING NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS. The plaintiff's Motion [Doc. #7 is DENIED, and pursuant to the terms of the Notice, it is hereby ORDERED that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 12/6/18. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz). (Entered: 12/06/2018)

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Jerome Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(njz) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#6

(#6) RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/18. (njz) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

5 #5

Certified Mail Return Receipt

5 #4

Attachment PTAR

5 #3

Attachment Consent to Collect

5 #2

Attachment 1st page of motion for IFP

5 #1

Attachment 1st page of Bivens

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla with Bivens packet via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2018: #1 Attachment 1st page of Bivens, #2 Attachment 1st page of motion for IFP, #3 Attachment Consent to Collect, #4 Attachment PTAR, #5 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz). (Entered: 10/18/2018)

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-12465. (njz) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, Order Dismissing Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/10/18. (njz) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #9 MOTION FOR EXTENSION AND APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 12/7/18. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2018: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (njz). Modified on 12/10/2018-corrected description of attachment (njz). (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) (Styled as Notice of 30 Days) Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time to File, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jerome Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(njz) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOLLOWING NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS. The plaintiff's Motion [Doc. #7 is DENIED, and pursuant to the terms of the Notice, it is hereby ORDERED that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 12/6/18. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz). (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Jerome Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(njz) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/18. (njz) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla with Bivens packet via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2018: #1 Attachment 1st page of Bivens, #2 Attachment 1st page of motion for IFP, #3 Attachment Consent to Collect, #4 Attachment PTAR, #5 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz). (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-12465. (njz) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of West Virginia. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jerome Andrews against FCI Gilmer (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.