This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2018 at 07:43:41 (UTC).

Anderson v. Schieffer et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2018 Anderson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Schieffer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David E Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01626

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David E Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robin Anderson

Defendants

John Does 1-10

City of Glendale Wisconsin

Adam Wall

William Schieffer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark L Thomsen

Attorney at Gingras Cates & Wachs SC

3228 Turnberry Oak Dr - Ste 210

Waukesha, WI 53188

William F Sulton

Attorney at Gingras Cates & Wachs SC

3228 Turnberry Oak Dr - Ste 210

Waukesha, WI 53188

Defendant Attorney

John A Wolfgang

Attorney at Gunta Law Offices SC

9898 W Bluemound Rd - Ste 2

Wauwatosa, WI 53226

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Judges Procedures and Case Management Guidance

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 12/11/18. (Attachments: #1 Judges Procedures and Case Management Guidance) (cc: all counsel)(kah) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#15

(#15) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David E Jones: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 12/11/2018. Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 12/21/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 1/18/2019, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 2/22/2019, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 4/18/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2019, Status Conference re: mediation set for 2/21/2019 10:00 AM By Telephone before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 877-848-7030 and use access code 3866147# to join the call. Court enters Rule 502(d) Order. (Tape #9:32:07-9:44:13) (kah)

#14

(#14) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN Submitted on Behalf of Plaintiff and Defendants by Robin Anderson. (Thomsen, Mark)

13 #1

Judges Procedures and Case Management Guidance

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2018 09:30 AM By Telephone before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 877-848-7030 and use access code 3866147# to join the call. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 12/4/2018. (cc: all counsel) (Attachments: #1 Judges Procedures and Case Management Guidance)(kah)

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, With Affirmative Defenses by City of Glendale Wisconsin, William Schieffer, Adam Wall.(Wolfgang, John)

#10

(#10) DISCLOSURE Statement by City of Glendale Wisconsin, William Schieffer, Adam Wall. (Wolfgang, John)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robin Anderson. City of Glendale Wisconsin served on 10/18/2018. (Thomsen, Mark)

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE Statement by Robin Anderson. (Thomsen, Mark)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L Thomsen on behalf of Robin Anderson. Attorney(s) appearing: Mark L. Thomsen (Thomsen, Mark)

1 #4

Summons Summons to City of Glendale

1 #3

Summons Summons to Wall

1 #2

Summons Summons to Schieffer

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, With Affirmative Defenses by City of Glendale Wisconsin, William Schieffer, Adam Wall.(Wolfgang, John)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 12/11/18. (Attachments: #1 Judges Procedures and Case Management Guidance) (cc: all counsel)(kah) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David E Jones: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 12/11/2018. Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 12/21/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 1/18/2019, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 2/22/2019, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 4/18/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2019, Status Conference re: mediation set for 2/21/2019 10:00 AM By Telephone before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 877-848-7030 and use access code 3866147# to join the call. Court enters Rule 502(d) Order. (Tape #9:32:07-9:44:13) (kah)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN Submitted on Behalf of Plaintiff and Defendants by Robin Anderson. (Thomsen, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2018 09:30 AM By Telephone before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 877-848-7030 and use access code 3866147# to join the call. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 12/4/2018. (cc: all counsel) (Attachments: #1 Judges Procedures and Case Management Guidance)(kah)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (kah)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by City of Glendale Wisconsin, William Schieffer, Adam Wall. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Wolfgang, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANTS requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge David E Jones be filed within 14 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, With Affirmative Defenses by City of Glendale Wisconsin, William Schieffer, Adam Wall.(Wolfgang, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCLOSURE Statement by City of Glendale Wisconsin, William Schieffer, Adam Wall. (Wolfgang, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John A Wolfgang on behalf of City of Glendale Wisconsin, William Schieffer, Adam Wall. Attorney(s) appearing: John A. Wolfgang, Gregg J. Gunta and Ann C. Wirth (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Wolfgang, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robin Anderson. Adam Wall served on 10/18/2018. (Thomsen, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robin Anderson. City of Glendale Wisconsin served on 10/18/2018. (Thomsen, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Robin Anderson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Thomsen, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • (#4) TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 10/16/18. Plaintiff must file proof of service of the complaint or a report on the status of service for each defendant within 45 days of the date of this order. Please note that there is no document attached to this order. (cc: all counsel)(kah)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Summons Issued as to City of Glendale Wisconsin, William Schieffer, Adam Wall. (kah)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (kah)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE Statement by Robin Anderson. (Thomsen, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L Thomsen on behalf of Robin Anderson. Attorney(s) appearing: Mark L. Thomsen (Thomsen, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (cms)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Robin Anderson. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2943979) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Schieffer, #3 Summons Summons to Wall, #4 Summons Summons to City of Glendale)(Thomsen, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.