Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2019 at 07:51:33 (UTC).

ANDERSON v. QDOBA RESTAURANT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 ANDERSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against QDOBA RESTAURANT CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-03578

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amy Anderson

Defendant

Qdoba Restaurant Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason A. Shartzer

Attorney at SHARTZER LAW FIRM LLC

156 E. Market Street, 10Th Floor, Suite 1000

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Miriam A. Rich

Attorney at HENNESSY & ROACH PC

8910 Purdue Road, Suite 170

Indianapolis, IN 46268

Hayleigh Jo Neumann

Attorney at HENNESSY & ROACH, P.C.

8910 Purdue Road, Suite 170

Indianapolis, IN 46268

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/11/2019.(SWM) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 6/3/2019. Discovery due by 12/6/2019. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/11/2019. (GD) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/11/2019. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/25/2019 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Settlement Conference set for 7/16/2019 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#10

(#10) Proposed CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant QDOBA RESTAURANT CORPORATION . (Rich, Miriam) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #8 Motion to Refund Duplicative Filing Fee. Copy to Finance Department. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/2/2019. (SWM) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

8 #2

Text of Proposed Order

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) MOTION for Refund, filed by Defendant QDOBA RESTAURANT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rich, Miriam) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Hayleigh Jo Neumann on behalf of Defendant QDOBA RESTAURANT CORPORATION. (Neumann, Hayleigh) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2019 at 2:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/19/2018.(SWM) Modified on 12/20/2018 (GD). (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/20/2018) (GD). (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Qdoba Restaurant Corporation. (Rich, Miriam) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Miriam A. Rich on behalf of Defendant Qdoba Restaurant Corporation. (Rich, Miriam) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#2

(#2) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by Qdoba Restaurant Corporation.(Rich, Miriam) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Demand

1 #2

Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court, case number 49D06-1810-CT-042569, filed by Qdoba Restaurant Corporation. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5158741) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Complaint, Summons, Appearance, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Demand, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rich, Miriam) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/11/2019.(SWM) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 6/3/2019. Discovery due by 12/6/2019. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/11/2019. (GD) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/11/2019. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/25/2019 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Settlement Conference set for 7/16/2019 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Proposed CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant QDOBA RESTAURANT CORPORATION . (Rich, Miriam) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #8 Motion to Refund Duplicative Filing Fee. Copy to Finance Department. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/2/2019. (SWM) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Refund, filed by Defendant QDOBA RESTAURANT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rich, Miriam) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Hayleigh Jo Neumann on behalf of Defendant QDOBA RESTAURANT CORPORATION. (Neumann, Hayleigh) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2019 at 2:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/19/2018.(SWM) Modified on 12/20/2018 (GD). (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/20/2018) (GD). (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Qdoba Restaurant Corporation. (Rich, Miriam) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Miriam A. Rich on behalf of Defendant Qdoba Restaurant Corporation. (Rich, Miriam) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by Qdoba Restaurant Corporation.(Rich, Miriam) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court, case number 49D06-1810-CT-042569, filed by Qdoba Restaurant Corporation. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5158741) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Complaint, Summons, Appearance, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Demand, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rich, Miriam) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QDOBA RESTAURANT CORPORATION is a litigant