This case was last updated from PACER on 01/27/2019 at 07:39:45 (UTC).

Anderson v. Columbia County et al

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 Anderson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Columbia County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is John V. Acosta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02058

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John V. Acosta

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Sandra Anderson

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Columbia County

John Does 1-6

Bryan Cutright

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Jacob Johnstun

Attorney at Johnstun Injury Law LLC

Suite A, 1935 St. Helens Street

St. Helens, OR 97051

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Steven A. Kraemer

Attorney at Kraemer & Lewis

Po Box 1469

Lake Oswego, OR 97035

David C. Lewis

Attorney at Kraemer & Lewis

P.O. Box 1469

Lake Oswego, OR 97035

Craig M. Johnson

Attorney at Oregon Department of Justice

1162 Court St. Ne

Salem, OR 97301

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/3/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/3/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/3/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (jtj) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#14

(#14) Reply (titled "State Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response [Dkt #13] to Defendants Bryan Cutright's and John Doe #1's Motion to Dismiss"). Filed by Bryan Cutright. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #13 .) (Johnson, Craig) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#13

(#13) Response to Motion to Dismiss (titled "Defendants Bryan Cutright and John Doe #1's Motion to Dismiss") #10 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Johnstun, Jacob) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#15

(#15) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Johnstun, Jacob) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#10

(#10) Motion to Dismiss (titled "Defendants Bryan Cutright and John Doe #1's Motion to Dismiss"). Filed by Bryan Cutright. (Johnson, Craig) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#8

(#8) Return of Service Executed as to Columbia County served on 12/11/2018, answer due on 1/2/2019. (Johnstun, Jacob) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to Columbia County, Bryan Cutright. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons Filed by Sandra Anderson. (Johnstun, Jacob) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons Filed by Sandra Anderson. (Johnstun, Jacob) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#9

(#9) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , Counterclaim Sandra Anderson. Filed by Columbia County. (Lewis, David) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed as to Bryan Cutright served on 12/11/2018, answer due on 1/2/2019. (Johnstun, Jacob) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#1

(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5649772 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Sandra Anderson against All Defendants. (Johnstun, Jacob) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by Sandra Anderson. (Johnstun, Jacob) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Order by Judge Acosta- regarding Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #15 . Motion will be taken under advisement as of 3/1/2019. (kms) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Johnstun, Jacob) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Reply (titled "State Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response [Dkt #13] to Defendants Bryan Cutright's and John Doe #1's Motion to Dismiss"). Filed by Bryan Cutright. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #13 .) (Johnson, Craig) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Response to Motion to Dismiss (titled "Defendants Bryan Cutright and John Doe #1's Motion to Dismiss") #10 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Johnstun, Jacob) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • (#12) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - SETTING a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for Monday, 3/25/2019 at 10:00AM. The court's conference line call-in information will be sent to counsel by separate sealed entry. (peg) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - Defendants Cutright and John Doe #1's Motion to Dismiss #10 will be taken under advisement as of 2/6/2019. (peg) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Motion to Dismiss (titled "Defendants Bryan Cutright and John Doe #1's Motion to Dismiss"). Filed by Bryan Cutright. (Johnson, Craig) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , Counterclaim Sandra Anderson. Filed by Columbia County. (Lewis, David) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Return of Service Executed as to Columbia County served on 12/11/2018, answer due on 1/2/2019. (Johnstun, Jacob) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Return of Service Executed as to Bryan Cutright served on 12/11/2018, answer due on 1/2/2019. (Johnstun, Jacob) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to Columbia County, Bryan Cutright. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Summons Filed by Sandra Anderson. (Johnstun, Jacob) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons Filed by Sandra Anderson. (Johnstun, Jacob) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/3/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/3/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/3/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (jtj) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by Sandra Anderson. (Johnstun, Jacob) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5649772 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Sandra Anderson against All Defendants. (Johnstun, Jacob) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.