This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:56:52 (UTC).

Anderson v. Brose Spartanburg Inc

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Anderson filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Brose Spartanburg Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin McDonald and Timothy M Cain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:18-CV-02688

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kevin McDonald

Presiding Judge

Timothy M Cain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alicia Anderson

Defendant

Brose Spartanburg Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

W Andrew Arnold

Attorney at Horton Law Firm

307 Pettigru Street

Greenville, SC 29601

Defendant Attorneys

Katie Michelle Brown

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet (Gville)

Po Box 10648

Greenville, SC 29603

Mark W Bakker

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet (Gville)

Po Box 10648

Greenville, SC 29603

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Brose Spartanburg Inc.(kric, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

1 #1

State Court Documents

#9

(#9) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alicia Anderson.(Arnold, W) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#11

(#11) Joint Discovery Plan and Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Brose Spartanburg Inc., Alicia Anderson (Brown, Katie) Modified on 11/6/2018 to edit filers and text (kric, ). (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#10

(#10) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Brose Spartanburg Inc., Alicia Anderson (Brown, Katie) Modified on 11/6/2018 to edit filers and text (kric, ). (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018CP4203048. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8031500), filed by Brose Spartanburg Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kric, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/23/2018, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/6/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 11/6/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/17/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/16/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/15/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/15/2019, Discovery due by 3/18/2019, Motions due by 4/1/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/3/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 6/3/2019, Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/3/2018. (kric, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Brose Spartanburg Inc.(Brown, Katie) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#13

(#13) ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Alicia Anderson(Arnold, W) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#12

(#12) ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Brose Spartanburg Inc(Brown, Katie) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#7

(#7) MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 3/25/2019, Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/3/2018. (kric, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Alicia Anderson(Arnold, W) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Brose Spartanburg Inc(Brown, Katie) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint Discovery Plan and Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Brose Spartanburg Inc., Alicia Anderson (Brown, Katie) Modified on 11/6/2018 to edit filers and text (kric, ). (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Brose Spartanburg Inc., Alicia Anderson (Brown, Katie) Modified on 11/6/2018 to edit filers and text (kric, ). (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alicia Anderson.(Arnold, W) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Brose Spartanburg Inc.(Brown, Katie) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 3/25/2019, Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/3/2018. (kric, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/23/2018, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/6/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 11/6/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/17/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/16/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/15/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/15/2019, Discovery due by 3/18/2019, Motions due by 4/1/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/3/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 6/3/2019, Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/3/2018. (kric, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • (#4) CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff LR26.01 interrogatories due by 10/16/2018. (kric, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Brose Spartanburg Inc.(kric, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018CP4203048. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8031500), filed by Brose Spartanburg Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kric, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.