This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2019 at 23:01:17 (UTC).

ANDERSON HOSPITAL et al v. HARGAN

Case Summary

On 12/21/2017 ANDERSON HOSPITAL filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against HARGAN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudolph Contreras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-02749

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rudolph Contreras

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PROMEDICA BIXBY HOSPITAL

PALMETTO HEALTH EASLEY

SOUTH SHORE HOSPITAL

BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL

FLOYD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

COMMUNITY HOSPITAL SOUTH

KARMANOS CANCER HOSPITAL

BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER

RUSH NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER

FLUSHING HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER MARSHALL

FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL

GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER

MCLAREN LAPEER HOSPITAL

GASTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS

COPLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

REID HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES

HENRY COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

ELKHART GENERAL HOSPITAL

58 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nolan Kent Smith

Attorney at HALL RENDER KILLIAN HEALTH & LYMAN, P.C.

500 North Meridian Street, Suite 400

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1293

N. Kent Smith

Attorney at HALL RENDER KILLIAN HEALTH & LYMAN, P.C.

500 North Meridian Street, Suite 400

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1293

Other Attorneys

Serena Maya Schulz Orloff

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Joint STATUS REPORT by ERIC D. HARGAN. (Orloff, Serena) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#11

(#11) Joint STATUS REPORT by ERIC D. HARGAN. (Orloff, Serena) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ERIC D. HARGAN (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena) (Entered: 03/02/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of ERIC D. HARGAN (Orloff, Serena) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

8 #1

Errata Certified Card & USPS Tracking

#8

(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/3/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Errata Certified Card & USPS Tracking)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 01/15/2018)

7 #1

Exhibit Certified Mail Card & USPS Tracking

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ERIC D. HARGAN served on 1/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Card & USPS Tracking)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

6 #1

Exhibit Certified Card & USPS Tracking

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01-03-18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Card & USPS Tracking)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

5 #1

Notice and Consent

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ERIC D. HARGAN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 12/26/2017)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:16-cv-150. (Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 12/21/2017)

#3

(#3) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANDERSON HOSPITAL, AUGUSTA MEDICAL CENTER, BAXTER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAY PARK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL, BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER, CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL SOUTH, COPLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, DEARBORN COUNTY HOSPITAL, DEKALB MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, EAST ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER, ELKHART GENERAL HOSPITAL, ESKENAZI HEALTH, FAYETTE REGIONAL HEALTH SERVICES, FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, FLOWER HOSPITAL, FLOYD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, FLUSHING HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, GASTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL, GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER MARSHALL, GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, GWINNETT HOSPITAL SYSTEM, HANCOCK REGIONAL HOSPITAL, HENRY COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HIGH POINT REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM, JACKSON COUNTY SCHNECK MEMORIAL, JAMAICA HOSPITAL, JOHN FITZGIBBON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JOHN H. STROGER HOSPITAL, JOHNSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, KARMANOS CANCER HOSPITAL, KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY HOSPITAL, MAJOR HOSPITAL, MARION GENERAL HOSPITAL, MCLAREN GREATER LANSING, MCLAREN LAPEER HOSPITAL, MCLAREN MACOMB, MCLAREN OAKLAND, MCLAREN PORT HURON, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF SOUTH BEND, NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, OAK FOREST HOSPITAL, OHIO VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, PALMETTO EASLEY, PALMETTO HEALTH BAPTIST COLUMBIA, PALMETTO HEALTH EASLEY, PALMETTO HEALTH RICHLAND, PARKLAND HEALTH AND HOSPITAL SYSTEM, PROMEDICA BIXBY HOSPITAL, PROVIDENT HOSPITAL, REID HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, RUSH NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, SOUTH SHORE HOSPITAL, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, STONEWALL JACKSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, THOMAS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, TOLEDO HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY OF IOWA HOSPITALS AND CLINICS, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA, UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA MEDICAL CENTER, WAYNE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL INC., WITHAM HEALTH SERVICES, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND, WOOSTER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 12/21/2017)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nolan Kent Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, Nolan) . (Entered: 12/21/2017)

1 #3

Summons to Jeff Sessions, US Attorney General

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT UNDER THE MEDICARE ACT against ERIC D. HARGAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5259699) filed by HENRY COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HANCOCK REGIONAL HOSPITAL, SOUTH SHORE HOSPITAL, FLOWER HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA, CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GASTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ESKENAZI HEALTH, UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA MEDICAL CENTER, EAST ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN GREATER LANSING, PALMETTO HEALTH BAPTIST COLUMBIA, WITHAM HEALTH SERVICES, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, PALMETTO HEALTH RICHLAND, REID HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, GWINNETT HOSPITAL SYSTEM, JAMAICA HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, JACKSON COUNTY SCHNECK MEMORIAL, MCLAREN PORT HURON, STONEWALL JACKSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER MARSHALL, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF SOUTH BEND, KARMANOS CANCER HOSPITAL, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, PARKLAND HEALTH AND HOSPITAL SYSTEM, LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL SOUTH, DEKALB MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, OAK FOREST HOSPITAL, PROVIDENT HOSPITAL, PALMETTO HEALTH EASLEY, WAYNE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL INC., MCLAREN LAPEER HOSPITAL, GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL, WOOSTER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, FAYETTE REGIONAL HEALTH SERVICES, RUSH NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, PALMETTO EASLEY, TOLEDO HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF IOWA HOSPITALS AND CLINICS, THOMAS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, AUGUSTA MEDICAL CENTER, ELKHART GENERAL HOSPITAL, ANDERSON HOSPITAL, GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND, KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, DEARBORN COUNTY HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS MEDICAL CENTER, PROMEDICA BIXBY HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, OHIO VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, FLOYD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MAJOR HOSPITAL, MCLAREN MACOMB, FLUSHING HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, COPLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER, BAXTER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JOHN FITZGIBBON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN OAKLAND, CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, JOHNSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BAY PARK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HIGH POINT REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM, JOHN H. STROGER HOSPITAL, MARION GENERAL HOSPITAL, BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Eric D. Hargan, Acting Secretary, #3 Summons to Jeff Sessions, US Attorney General, #4 Summons to Jessie Liu, US Attorney)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 12/21/2017)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #12 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report within thirty days of the Supreme Court's decision in Azar v. Allina Health Services, No. 17-1484. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/29/2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Joint STATUS REPORT by ERIC D. HARGAN. (Orloff, Serena) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #11 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report within thirty days of the Supreme Court's grant or denial of certiorari in Azar v. Allina Health Services (No. 17-1484). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on May 29, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint STATUS REPORT by ERIC D. HARGAN. (Orloff, Serena) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #10 the parties' Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant to file its answer to the complaint is VACATED. The parties shall file a joint status report within thirty days of the earlier of the filing of a petition for certiorari in Allina Health Services, et al. v. Azar, No. 16-5255 (D.C. Cir.) or the expiration of the deadline for such a filing. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 2, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ERIC D. HARGAN (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena) (Entered: 03/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of ERIC D. HARGAN (Orloff, Serena) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/3/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Errata Certified Card & USPS Tracking)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 01/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ERIC D. HARGAN served on 1/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Card & USPS Tracking)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01-03-18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Card & USPS Tracking)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ERIC D. HARGAN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 12/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 12/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:16-cv-150. (Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 12/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANDERSON HOSPITAL, AUGUSTA MEDICAL CENTER, BAXTER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAY PARK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL, BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER, CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL SOUTH, COPLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, DEARBORN COUNTY HOSPITAL, DEKALB MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, EAST ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER, ELKHART GENERAL HOSPITAL, ESKENAZI HEALTH, FAYETTE REGIONAL HEALTH SERVICES, FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, FLOWER HOSPITAL, FLOYD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, FLUSHING HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, GASTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL, GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER MARSHALL, GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, GWINNETT HOSPITAL SYSTEM, HANCOCK REGIONAL HOSPITAL, HENRY COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HIGH POINT REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM, JACKSON COUNTY SCHNECK MEMORIAL, JAMAICA HOSPITAL, JOHN FITZGIBBON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JOHN H. STROGER HOSPITAL, JOHNSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, KARMANOS CANCER HOSPITAL, KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY HOSPITAL, MAJOR HOSPITAL, MARION GENERAL HOSPITAL, MCLAREN GREATER LANSING, MCLAREN LAPEER HOSPITAL, MCLAREN MACOMB, MCLAREN OAKLAND, MCLAREN PORT HURON, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF SOUTH BEND, NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, OAK FOREST HOSPITAL, OHIO VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, PALMETTO EASLEY, PALMETTO HEALTH BAPTIST COLUMBIA, PALMETTO HEALTH EASLEY, PALMETTO HEALTH RICHLAND, PARKLAND HEALTH AND HOSPITAL SYSTEM, PROMEDICA BIXBY HOSPITAL, PROVIDENT HOSPITAL, REID HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, RUSH NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, SOUTH SHORE HOSPITAL, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, STONEWALL JACKSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, THOMAS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, TOLEDO HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY OF IOWA HOSPITALS AND CLINICS, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA, UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA MEDICAL CENTER, WAYNE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL INC., WITHAM HEALTH SERVICES, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND, WOOSTER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 12/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nolan Kent Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, Nolan) . (Entered: 12/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT UNDER THE MEDICARE ACT against ERIC D. HARGAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5259699) filed by HENRY COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HANCOCK REGIONAL HOSPITAL, SOUTH SHORE HOSPITAL, FLOWER HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA, CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GASTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ESKENAZI HEALTH, UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA MEDICAL CENTER, EAST ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN GREATER LANSING, PALMETTO HEALTH BAPTIST COLUMBIA, WITHAM HEALTH SERVICES, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, PALMETTO HEALTH RICHLAND, REID HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, GWINNETT HOSPITAL SYSTEM, JAMAICA HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, JACKSON COUNTY SCHNECK MEMORIAL, MCLAREN PORT HURON, STONEWALL JACKSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER MARSHALL, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF SOUTH BEND, KARMANOS CANCER HOSPITAL, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, PARKLAND HEALTH AND HOSPITAL SYSTEM, LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL SOUTH, DEKALB MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, OAK FOREST HOSPITAL, PROVIDENT HOSPITAL, PALMETTO HEALTH EASLEY, WAYNE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL INC., MCLAREN LAPEER HOSPITAL, GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL, WOOSTER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, FAYETTE REGIONAL HEALTH SERVICES, RUSH NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, PALMETTO EASLEY, TOLEDO HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF IOWA HOSPITALS AND CLINICS, THOMAS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, AUGUSTA MEDICAL CENTER, ELKHART GENERAL HOSPITAL, ANDERSON HOSPITAL, GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND, KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, DEARBORN COUNTY HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS MEDICAL CENTER, PROMEDICA BIXBY HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, OHIO VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, FLOYD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MAJOR HOSPITAL, MCLAREN MACOMB, FLUSHING HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, COPLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER, BAXTER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JOHN FITZGIBBON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN OAKLAND, CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, JOHNSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BAY PARK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HIGH POINT REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM, JOHN H. STROGER HOSPITAL, MARION GENERAL HOSPITAL, BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Eric D. Hargan, Acting Secretary, #3 Summons to Jeff Sessions, US Attorney General, #4 Summons to Jessie Liu, US Attorney)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 12/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.