This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 13:08:58 (UTC).

ANDALUSIA HEALTH et al v. AZAR, II

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 ANDALUSIA HEALTH filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against AZAR, II. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Tanya S. Chutkan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01756

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya S. Chutkan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KING'S DAUGHTERS' HOSPITAL & HEALTH SERVICES

CENTEGRA HOSPITAL - WOODSTOCK

BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS

CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER MARSHALL

BAPTIST HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER - NORTH LITTLE ROCK

IREDELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

JANE PHILLIPS MEDICAL CENTER

BAPTIST HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER - LITTLE ROCK

GREAT RIVER MEDICAL CENTER

CAPE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER

ASPIRUS RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL

CARONDELET HEART & VASCULAR INSTITUTE

HENRY COMMUNITY HEALTH

FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER - MAIN CAMPUS

EVANSTON HOSPITAL

HOLY FAMILY MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER

COMANCHE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Defendant

ALEX M. AZAR, II

128 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel F. Miller

Attorney at HALL RENDER KILLIAN HEATH & LYMAN, P.C.

111 East Kilbourn Avenue, Suite 1300

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendant Attorney

Peter M. Bryce

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 883

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Alex M. Azar II

1 #3

Summons U.S. Attorney General

1 #4

Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Summons #2

5 #2

Summons #3

5 #3

Notice and Consent

#6

#7

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 09/15/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 8/14/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/09/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/14/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/13/2018.) (Miller, Daniel) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons #2, #2 Summons #3, #3 Notice and Consent)(ztl) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ERRATA Adding Exhibit 1 to Complaint by ANDALUSIA HEALTH, ANDERSON HOSPITAL, ASPIRUS RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL, BAPTIST HEALTH FLOYD, BAPTIST HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER - LITTLE ROCK, BAPTIST HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER - NORTH LITTLE ROCK, BAPTIST HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER-HOT SPRING COUNTY, BAXTER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - FARMINGTON HILLS, BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS, CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CAPE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, CARONDELET HEART & VASCULAR INSTITUTE, CARONDELET SAINT JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL, CENTEGRA HOSPITAL - WOODSTOCK, CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER, CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER MARSHALL, CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COMANCHE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, CONWAY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DECATUR MORGAN HOSPITAL-PARKWAY CAMPUS, EAST ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER, EVANSTON HOSPITAL, FAIRFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER - MAIN CAMPUS, FITZGIBBON HOSPITAL, FLUSHING HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, FREEMAN WEST, FROEDTERT & MEDICAL COLLEGE OF WISCONSIN, GENESYS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, GOLDEN VALLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GREAT RIVER MEDICAL CENTER, GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, GWINNETT MEDICAL CENTER - LAWRENCEVILLE, HANCOCK REGIONAL HOSPITAL, HAVASU REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HEALTHMARK OF WALTON, INC. D/B/A HEALTHMARK REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HENDRICKS REGIONAL HEALTH DANVILLE, HENRY COMMUNITY HEALTH, HOLLAND HOSPITAL, HOLY FAMILY MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, IREDELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JACKSON PURCHASE MEDICAL CENTER, JANE PHILLIPS MEDICAL CENTER, JOHN H. STROGER, JR., HOSPITAL OF COOK COUNTY, JOHN T. MATHER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE, KING'S DAUGHTERS' HOSPITAL & HEALTH SERVICES #1 Complaint,,,,,,, filed by HENDRICKS REGIONAL HEALTH DANVILLE, BAPTIST HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER-HOT SPRING COUNTY, EVANSTON HOSPITAL, FROEDTERT & MEDICAL COLLEGE OF WISCONSIN, ANDALUSIA HEALTH, HOLLAND HOSPITAL, GWINNETT MEDICAL CENTER - LAWRENCEVILLE, CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER, GENESYS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CAPE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COMANCHE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CARONDELET SAINT JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL, HENRY COMMUNITY HEALTH, IREDELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HEALTHMARK OF WALTON, INC., FREEMAN WEST, GREAT RIVER MEDICAL CENTER, ANDERSON HOSPITAL, BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS, GOLDEN VALLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JANE PHILLIPS MEDICAL CENTER, FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER - MAIN CAMPUS, CARONDELET HEART & VASCULAR INSTITUTE, CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER MARSHALL, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - FARMINGTON HILLS, GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, FITZGIBBON HOSPITAL, BAPTIST HEALTH FLOYD, ASPIRUS RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL, EAST ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER, JACKSON PURCHASE MEDICAL CENTER, JOHN H. STROGER, JR., HOSPITAL OF COOK COUNTY, HANCOCK REGIONAL HOSPITAL, CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, FAIRFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, KING'S DAUGHTERS' HOSPITAL & HEALTH SERVICES, CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, FLUSHING HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, HOLY FAMILY MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, DECATUR MORGAN HOSPITAL-PARKWAY CAMPUS, BAPTIST HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER - NORTH LITTLE ROCK, CENTEGRA HOSPITAL - WOODSTOCK, KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE, BAXTER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HAVASU REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JOHN T. MATHER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BAPTIST HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER - LITTLE ROCK, CONWAY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Miller, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ANDALUSIA HEALTH, ANDERSON HOSPITAL, ASPIRUS RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL, BAPTIST HEALTH FLOYD, BAPTIST HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER - LITTLE ROCK, BAPTIST HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER - NORTH LITTLE ROCK, BAPTIST HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER-HOT SPRING COUNTY, BAXTER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - FARMINGTON HILLS, BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS, CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CAPE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, CARONDELET HEART & VASCULAR INSTITUTE, CARONDELET SAINT JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL, CENTEGRA HOSPITAL - WOODSTOCK, CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER, CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER MARSHALL, CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COMANCHE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, CONWAY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DECATUR MORGAN HOSPITAL-PARKWAY CAMPUS, EAST ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER, EVANSTON HOSPITAL, FAIRFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER - MAIN CAMPUS, FITZGIBBON HOSPITAL, FLUSHING HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, FREEMAN WEST, FROEDTERT & MEDICAL COLLEGE OF WISCONSIN, GENESYS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, GOLDEN VALLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GREAT RIVER MEDICAL CENTER, GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, GWINNETT MEDICAL CENTER - LAWRENCEVILLE, HANCOCK REGIONAL HOSPITAL, HAVASU REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HEALTHMARK OF WALTON, INC., HENDRICKS REGIONAL HEALTH DANVILLE, HENRY COMMUNITY HEALTH, HOLLAND HOSPITAL, HOLY FAMILY MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, IREDELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JACKSON PURCHASE MEDICAL CENTER, JANE PHILLIPS MEDICAL CENTER, JOHN H. STROGER, JR., HOSPITAL OF COOK COUNTY, JOHN T. MATHER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE, KING'S DAUGHTERS' HOSPITAL & HEALTH SERVICES. Case related to Case No. 1:17-cv-01519. (Miller, Daniel) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/31/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANDALUSIA HEALTH, ANDERSON HOSPITAL, ASPIRUS RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL, BAPTIST HEALTH FLOYD, BAPTIST HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER - LITTLE ROCK, BAPTIST HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER - NORTH LITTLE ROCK, BAPTIST HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER-HOT SPRING COUNTY, BAXTER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - FARMINGTON HILLS, BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS, CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CAPE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, CARONDELET HEART & VASCULAR INSTITUTE, CARONDELET SAINT JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL, CENTEGRA HOSPITAL - WOODSTOCK, CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER, CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER MARSHALL, CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COMANCHE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, CONWAY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DECATUR MORGAN HOSPITAL-PARKWAY CAMPUS, EAST ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER, EVANSTON HOSPITAL, FAIRFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER - MAIN CAMPUS, FITZGIBBON HOSPITAL, FLUSHING HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, FREEMAN WEST, FROEDTERT & MEDICAL COLLEGE OF WISCONSIN, GENESYS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, GOLDEN VALLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GREAT RIVER MEDICAL CENTER, GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, GWINNETT MEDICAL CENTER - LAWRENCEVILLE, HANCOCK REGIONAL HOSPITAL, HAVASU REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HEALTHMARK OF WALTON, INC., HENDRICKS REGIONAL HEALTH DANVILLE, HENRY COMMUNITY HEALTH, HOLLAND HOSPITAL, HOLY FAMILY MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, IREDELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JACKSON PURCHASE MEDICAL CENTER, JANE PHILLIPS MEDICAL CENTER, JOHN H. STROGER, JR., HOSPITAL OF COOK COUNTY, JOHN T. MATHER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE, KING'S DAUGHTERS' HOSPITAL & HEALTH SERVICES (Miller, Daniel) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/31/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5608310) filed by GOLDEN VALLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GENESYS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BAPTIST HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER-HOT SPRING COUNTY, FAIRFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER MARSHALL, ANDERSON HOSPITAL, ANDALUSIA HEALTH, CHRISTUS GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER, FREEMAN WEST, CENTEGRA HOSPITAL - WOODSTOCK, IREDELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER - MAIN CAMPUS, EVANSTON HOSPITAL, FITZGIBBON HOSPITAL, HENDRICKS REGIONAL HEALTH DANVILLE, COMANCHE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CARONDELET HEART & VASCULAR INSTITUTE, KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE, EAST ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER, BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS, FROEDTERT & MEDICAL COLLEGE OF WISCONSIN, GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JOHN T. MATHER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HOLLAND HOSPITAL, CONWAY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JANE PHILLIPS MEDICAL CENTER, CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, DECATUR MORGAN HOSPITAL-PARKWAY CAMPUS, FLUSHING HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAPTIST HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER - NORTH LITTLE ROCK, KING'S DAUGHTERS' HOSPITAL & HEALTH SERVICES, HEALTHMARK OF WALTON, INC., GWINNETT MEDICAL CENTER - LAWRENCEVILLE, ASPIRUS RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - FARMINGTON HILLS, HENRY COMMUNITY HEALTH, CAPE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JOHN H. STROGER, JR., HOSPITAL OF COOK COUNTY, CARONDELET SAINT JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL, HAVASU REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAXTER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAPTIST HEALTH FLOYD, GREAT RIVER MEDICAL CENTER, JACKSON PURCHASE MEDICAL CENTER, HANCOCK REGIONAL HOSPITAL, HOLY FAMILY MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BAPTIST HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER - LITTLE ROCK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Alex M. Azar II, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Miller, Daniel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/3/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less