This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/03/2018 at 07:58:27 (UTC).

Anaya v. Tricam Industries, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Anaya filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Tricam Industries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando L. Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-01045

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orlando L. Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Judy Anaya

Defendants

Costco Wholesale Corporation

Rubbermaid, Inc.

Tricam Industries, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sonia M. Rodriguez

Attorney at Cowen Rodriguez Peacock

6243 Ih-10 West, Suite 801

San Antonio, TX 78201

Michael R. Cowen

Attorney at Cowen Mask Blanchard

6243 Ih-10 West, Suite 801

San Antonio, TX 78201

Defendant Attorney

Arthur Scot Chase

Attorney at Law Office of A. Scot Chase

3200 Southwest Freeway, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77027

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Arthur Scot Chase (Jonathan R. Sichtermann) by on behalf of Tricam Industries, Inc.. (Chase, Arthur) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ($100 Fee Paid, Receipt #0542-11409373 by Arthur Scot Chase by on behalf of Tricam Industries, Inc.. (Chase, Arthur) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#7

(#7) NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Judy Anaya. (Rodriguez, Sonia) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Arthur Scot Chase added to party Rubbermaid, Inc.(pty:dft) by Rubbermaid, Inc..(Chase, Arthur) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Arthur Scot Chase added to party Tricam Industries, Inc.(pty:dft) by Tricam Industries, Inc..(Chase, Arthur) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Arthur Scot Chase added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:dft) by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Chase, Arthur) (Entered: 10/27/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Tricam Industries, Inc., Rubbermaid, Inc., and Costco Wholesale Corporation. (bc) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

2 #2

Summons - Costco Wholesale Corporation

2 #1

Summons - Rubbermaid, Inc.

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Judy Anaya. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Rubbermaid, Inc., #2 Summons - Costco Wholesale Corporation)(Rodriguez, Sonia) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11307864), filed by Judy Anaya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodriguez, Sonia) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Arthur Scot Chase (Jonathan R. Sichtermann) by on behalf of Tricam Industries, Inc.. (Chase, Arthur) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ($100 Fee Paid, Receipt #0542-11409373 by Arthur Scot Chase by on behalf of Tricam Industries, Inc.. (Chase, Arthur) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Judy Anaya. (Rodriguez, Sonia) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Arthur Scot Chase added to party Rubbermaid, Inc.(pty:dft) by Rubbermaid, Inc..(Chase, Arthur) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Arthur Scot Chase added to party Tricam Industries, Inc.(pty:dft) by Tricam Industries, Inc..(Chase, Arthur) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Arthur Scot Chase added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:dft) by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Chase, Arthur) (Entered: 10/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Tricam Industries, Inc., Rubbermaid, Inc., and Costco Wholesale Corporation. (bc) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Judy Anaya. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Rubbermaid, Inc., #2 Summons - Costco Wholesale Corporation)(Rodriguez, Sonia) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11307864), filed by Judy Anaya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodriguez, Sonia) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less