Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/25/2018 at 07:08:49 (UTC).

Shayna Amster v. Starbucks Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2018 Shayna Amster filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Starbucks Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen L. Stevenson and Dolly M. Gee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-08327

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shayna Amster

Defendants

Starbucks Corporation

Does 1 through 50, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Victoria Bree Rivapalacio

Attorney at Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

Kyle R Nordrehaug

Attorney at Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

Ruchira Piya Mukherjee

Attorney at Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

Aparajit Bhowmik

Attorney at Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

Janine R Menhennet

Attorney at Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

Norman B Blumenthal

Attorney at Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

Jonathan M Lebe

Attorney at Lebe Law APLC

777 South Alameda Street 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90021

Defendant Attorneys

Judy M Iriye

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

2049 Century Park East 5Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3107

Keith A Jacoby

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

2049 Century Park East 5Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3107

Tina Sundar

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

50 West San Fernando Street 7Th Foor

San Jose, CA 95113

Rachael Sarah Lavi

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

2049 Century Park East 5Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3107

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) REPLY to Remand Case to #12 in Support of Motion to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Shayna Amster. (Mukherjee, Ruchira) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#20

(#20) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shayna Amster, (Mukherjee, Ruchira) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#19

(#19) NOTICE Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Request and Request to File Late-Received Declaration In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to State Court [Re. Docket No. 18] filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Sundar, Tina) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#18

(#18) DECLARATION of Judy M. Iriye in opposition to to Remand Case to #12 Decl. of Judy M. Iriye In Support of Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Request To File Late-Received Declaration In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Sundar, Tina) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

12 #4

Certificate of Service re Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case to State Court

12 #3

Proposed Order granting Plaintiffs Motion to Remand Case to State Court

12 #2

Declaration of Janine R. Menhennet in Support of Motion to Remand Case to State

12 #1

Notice of Motion to Remand Case to State Court

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Shayna Amster. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion to Remand Case to State Court, #2 Declaration of Janine R. Menhennet in Support of Motion to Remand Case to State Court, #3 Proposed Order granting Plaintiffs Motion to Remand Case to State Court, #4 Certificate of Service re Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case to State Court)(Menhennet, Janine) Modified on 11/19/2018 (gk). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

1 #11

Declaration of Julie Broxson

1 #10

Exhibit I - Proof of Service re Complaint

1 #9

Exhibit H - Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action

1 #8

Exhibit G - Initial Status Conference Order

1 #5

Exhibit D - Proof of Service for FAC

1 #4

Exhibit C - Documents Served with Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #1

Declaration of Rachael S. Lavi

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) REPLY to Remand Case to #12 in Support of Motion to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Shayna Amster. (Mukherjee, Ruchira) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shayna Amster, (Mukherjee, Ruchira) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Request and Request to File Late-Received Declaration In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to State Court [Re. Docket No. 18] filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Sundar, Tina) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) DECLARATION of Judy M. Iriye in opposition to to Remand Case to #12 Decl. of Judy M. Iriye In Support of Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Request To File Late-Received Declaration In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Sundar, Tina) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Memorandum in Support of Motion, #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > Remand Case to State Court. The filer used the event, Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents > Memorandum in Support of Motion, which does not allow the filer to set the hearing date. For this one time only, clerk shall place this matter on calendar for the noticed date of 12/7/2018 at 9:30 AM. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case To State Court filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Iriye, Judy) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Judy M. Iriye, #2 Declaration Angela Wagner, #3 Proposed Order)(Iriye, Judy) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • (#14) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court sua sponte continue the Scheduling Conference from November 9, 2018 to December 7, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation.. (Iriye, Judy) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Shayna Amster. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion to Remand Case to State Court, #2 Declaration of Janine R. Menhennet in Support of Motion to Remand Case to State Court, #3 Proposed Order granting Plaintiffs Motion to Remand Case to State Court, #4 Certificate of Service re Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case to State Court)(Menhennet, Janine) Modified on 11/19/2018 (gk). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to First Amended Complaint filed by defendant Starbucks Corporation. ((Filed in state court 9/26/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 7)(esa) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Filed in state court 9/25/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 6)(esa) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • COPY OF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS executed by Plaintiff Shayna Amster, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 8/28/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent of Service of Process, by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 4) (esa) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • COPY OF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS executed by Plaintiff Shayna Amster, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 9/19/2018. Service of the Summons and Amended Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent of Service of Process, by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 50, Inclusive, Starbucks Corporation, filed by plaintiff Shayna Amster. (Filed in state court 9/17/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 3)(esa) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 50, Inclusive, Starbucks Corporation, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Shayna Amster. (Filed in state court 7/10/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Iriye, Judy) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, (Iriye, Judy) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC713390 Receipt No: 0973-22487522 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachael S. Lavi, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Documents Served with Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - Proof of Service for FAC, #6 Exhibit E - Answer to Complaint, #7 Exhibit F - Answer to FAC, #8 Exhibit G - Initial Status Conference Order, #9 Exhibit H - Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action, #10 Exhibit I - Proof of Service re Complaint, #11 Declaration of Julie Broxson) (Attorney Judy M Iriye added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Iriye, Judy) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Starbucks Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachael Sarah Lavi

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Judy M Iriye

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keith Adam Jacoby